Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ally Financial Inc. A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vanlochem Michael D, against Executor Of The Estate Of Vallerie Gloria Mae Rhone Aka Vallerie G. Mae Rhone Aka Vallerie G. Rhone Aka Vallerie Gloria M. Rhone Aka Vallerie M. Rhone Aka Vallerie Rhone An Individual, Rhone An Individual Vernon, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Doreen B. Boxer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDoreen B. Boxer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2020 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 22, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: June 22, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 19, 2021Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: January 27, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Ally Financial Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.