Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Hawthorne filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Hawthorne, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E. Blancarte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: John McCarty, Jr. (Appellant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 07, 2020Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 28, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Rescheduling 8/25/20 Hearing) of 06/26/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: John McCarty, Jr. (Appellant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.