Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Farmers Insurance Exchange A California Interinsurance Exchange, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Trabish Adam Charles, against Houston An Individual Dajuan, Houston?S Motor Sports A Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark E. Windham presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Default Judgment]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 22, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: June 08, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: June 08, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 08, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: July 24, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 02, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: December 14, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 05, 2021Order to Show Cause (Hearing) - Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: October 29, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal;)
Date: February 10, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: May 27, 2022Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033
Date: June 02, 2022Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: June 02, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Default Judgment]
Date: June 22, 2022Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: June 22, 2022Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
Date: July 22, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.