Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hernandez Antonio, Ho Eli, Ma Ya, Lopez Antonio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Hernandez Antonio, Ho Eli, Ma Ya, represented by Beck Dwayne S, Landrith Kevin S, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark E. Windham presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Antonio Hernandez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Eli Ho (Cross-Defendant); As to: Antonio Hernandez (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Antonio Hernandez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Eli Ho (Defendant); Ya Ma (Defendant); As to: Antonio Hernandez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Antonio Hernandez (Defendant); As to: Eli Ho (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Eli Ho (Defendant); Ya Ma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Antonio Hernandez (Defendant); As to: Eli Ho (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Antonio Hernandez (Defendant); As to: Antonio Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: February 28, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 28, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: February 28, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: February 28, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: February 28, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 11, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: May 19, 2020Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint
Date: May 19, 2020Request for Refund / Order - Request for Refund / Order
Date: May 26, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: July 30, 2020Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case
Date: July 30, 2020Answer - Answer
Date: July 30, 2020Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial
Date: July 30, 2020Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint
Date: July 30, 2020Answer - Answer
Date: August 11, 2020Answer - Answer
Date: August 28, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: April 15, 2021Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Antonio Hernandez (Defendant); As to: Eli Ho (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Eli Ho (Cross-Defendant); As to: Antonio Hernandez (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Antonio Hernandez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Eli Ho (Defendant); Ya Ma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Antonio Hernandez (Defendant); As to: Antonio Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Antonio Hernandez (Defendant); As to: Eli Ho (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Eli Ho (Defendant); Ya Ma (Defendant); As to: Antonio Hernandez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Antonio Hernandez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.