Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Samodanova Elena, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Gandelsman Julia, against Savchenko Gleb, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Elizabeth A. Grimes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
July 14, 2022 | Notice - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: QUASHING SUBPOENA AND SANCTIONS OFF CALENDAR (Comment) | ||
July 13, 2022 | Notice - Notice (Comment) | ||
June 22, 2022 | Court Order for Post-Judgment Requests for Orders FAM 120 | ||
June 21, 2022 | Declaration - Declaration (Declarations) | ||
June 21, 2022 | Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum - Points and Authorities (Memos) | ||
June 21, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
June 21, 2022 | Exhibit List - Exhibit List (Comment) | ||
June 21, 2022 | RFO/MTN - Quash - RFO/MTN - Quash - $60.00 (Comment) | ||
June 21, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 27 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 RFOMOD - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.