Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Martinez Olivia, Martinez Vicente, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Behjatnia Russell Farzin, against Barnes Willie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Complaint
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 17, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 17, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: December 18, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 17, 2020PI General Order
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 01, 2021Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Olivia Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Vicente Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Vicente Martinez (Plaintiff); Olivia Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Vicente Martinez (Plaintiff); Olivia Martinez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Vicente Martinez (Plaintiff); Olivia Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 01, 2021PI General Order
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.