Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Mitchell Valena, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Dufour Michael R., Dufour Michael Ryan, Dufour Michael Ryan Esq., Mccarthy Daniel B. Lien Claimant W D, against Bank Of The West, Bank Of The West Doe 1, First Santa Clara Corporation A California Corporation, First Santa Clara Corporation A California Corporation Doe 3, Pickford Investment Group Llc, (total of 7) See All represented by Feldman Ian Robert Esq., Weiner Mark R. Esq., Grant Mindi Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Jill T. Feeney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJune 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: February 07, 2023Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2024-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Bank of the West (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: January 04, 2023Exhibit List; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2024-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Bank of the West (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: December 02, 2022Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-04-02T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2024-03-28T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2024-03-28T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2024-03-28T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2024-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff); As to: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant); As to: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application , Filed by the Defendant for ...)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine mil 2; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine mil 5; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL R DUFOUR; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine mil 3; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine mil 4; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF DR. MIYEOUNG JO; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Reply REPLY; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Opposition To Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Bank of the West (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff); As to: Emily Quinn, (Doe 2) (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application, Filed by the Defendant for O...)
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Reply REPLY; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Taking Motion Off Calendar; Filed by: Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order (- Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial Filed by Defendants Ban...)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Michael R. Dufour (Attorney)
Date: 2023-10-04T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 01, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 01, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 16, 2020PI General Order
Date: January 04, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 28, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE
Date: January 28, 2021Answer
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: February 09, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 07, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Lien
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Lien
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 03, 2022Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: April 14, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL R DUFOUR
Date: April 18, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 21, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL 4
Date: April 25, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL 5
Date: April 25, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL 2
Date: April 25, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL 3
Date: April 25, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 25, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY
Date: April 27, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 05, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 13, 2022Separate Statement
Date: June 13, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 13, 2022Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: July 11, 2022Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: September 02, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 06, 2022Separate Statement
Date: September 06, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 06, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 06, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 07, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 06, 2022Separate Statement
Date: October 11, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 11, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 11, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 14, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: October 19, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: October 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: October 19, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: October 24, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)
Date: October 27, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: November 03, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 04, 2022Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: November 04, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 04, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: November 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL COMPELLING AUTHORIZATION OF UCLA ...)
Date: November 15, 2022Association of Attorney
Date: November 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 29, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: December 02, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: December 02, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 06, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED MOTION
Date: December 07, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: December 08, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED MOTION
Date: December 27, 2022Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: December 29, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: January 04, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: January 26, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: January 30, 2023Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS
Date: January 30, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR TO FILE PROOF OF SERVIC...)
Date: February 03, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: February 06, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS , EVIDENTIARY/ISS...)
Date: February 06, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: February 07, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: April 19, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 01, 2020Complaint
Date: December 01, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 13, 2022Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: June 23, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DR. MIYEOUNG JO
Date: June 30, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE...)
Date: September 07, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: October 03, 2022Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order (eFiling) Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Compelling the Independent Medica...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Compelling Independ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or, In The Alternative...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Reply (Re: Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial) Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application , Filed by the Defendant for ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for to File Proof of Servic...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED MOTION) Filed by Bank of the West (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Notice (OF REMOTE APPEARANCE) Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL R DUFOUR) Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE) Filed by Bank of the West (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial and All Trial Related Dat...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application, Filed by the Defendant for O...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Compelling Authorization of UCLA ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by Bank of the West (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DR. MIYEOUNG JO) Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion for Sanctions) Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial Filed by Defendants Ban...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Bank of the West and First Santa Clara ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Bank of the West (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Valena Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by Pickford Investment Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue Trial and All Trial Related Dates)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company's Notice of Lien Claim)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application , Filed by the Defendant for ...))
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL R DUFOUR)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Reply (REPLY)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE DISPARAGEMENT OF)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.