Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dominguez Martha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcreynolds C.R., against Lara Adolfo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael E. Whitaker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael E. Whitaker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Adolfo Lara (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Adolfo Lara (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 31, 2022PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 31, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Martha Dominguez (Plaintiff); As to: Adolfo Lara (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Martha Dominguez (Plaintiff); As to: Adolfo Lara (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Martha Dominguez (Plaintiff); As to: Adolfo Lara (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Order of Discharge - Chapter 7; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Adolfo Lara (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Adolfo Lara (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 01, 2020Complaint
Date: December 01, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 01, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 01, 2020Answer
Date: January 07, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: January 07, 2021PI General Order
Date: January 13, 2021Order - ORDER OF DISCHARGE - CHAPTER 7
Date: February 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: May 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: May 31, 2022Order - Dismissal
Date: May 31, 2022Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Order (of Discharge - Chapter 7)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.