Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jyoo Joseph, against Dilekoglu Narod Aka Narod M Dilekoglu Aka Narod M Dilekoglu, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Theresa M. Traber presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is a summons issued by the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. The plaintiff in this case is Discover Bank, and the defendant is Narod Dilekoglu, also known as Narod M Dilekoglu, along with Does 1-10. The defendant is ...
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Narod Dilekoglu (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 24, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Narod Dilekoglu (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Narod Dilekoglu (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Narod Dilekoglu (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Declaration Regarding Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: November 30, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 09, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE
Date: December 11, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 25, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 29, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: June 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: August 19, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 09, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: September 24, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: September 24, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 29, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.