Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority A Public Entity, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Frias Guillermo Antonio, against 1-200 Does, Acg Funding Inc., Clarion Mortgage Capital Inc. A Colorado Corporation, Cs Financial Inc., Denis John Joseph, (total of 23) See All represented by Banker Anish, Horowitz Jeffrey D., Shakibi Katayoun, Benbow Jillian Allyn, Mckenna Charles C, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2020 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Condemnation (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. (MERS) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. (MERS) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JMAC Lending, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: NEDMAC, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jacqueline W. Reynolds (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: George Jeep-Kung So (Defendant); Jackelyn Hsin-Yi Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. (MERS) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: JMAC Lending, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: David Pougatsch (Defendant); Annie Tsai (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: David Pougatsch (Defendant); Annie Tsai (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NEDMAC, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JMAC Lending, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jacqueline W. Reynolds (Defendant); Stephen D. Reynolds (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 07, 2020Answer
Date: December 16, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: December 17, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 17, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 30, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 12, 2021Answer
Date: January 14, 2021Answer
Date: January 21, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 25, 2021Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER FOR JUNE GORMAN
Date: January 28, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 28, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: January 29, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 29, 2021Answer
Date: February 01, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 05, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 24, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSITS OF PROFABLE COMPENSATION
Date: February 24, 2021Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: February 24, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 01, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS
Date: March 05, 2021Answer
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 15, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: March 18, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 26, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION RE PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: April 27, 2021Order - ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: May 03, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: May 06, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 12, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 13, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 24, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: May 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: RESOLUTION OF REMAINING DISPUTED ISSUES)
Date: September 10, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: October 14, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 28, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: RESOLUTION OF REMAINING DISPUTED ISSUES)
Date: December 27, 2021Case Management Order
Date: December 27, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: December 28, 2021Notice - NOTICE DEMAND FOR EXCHANGE OF LISTS OF EXPERT WITNESS AND STATEMENT OF VALUATION
Date: January 05, 2022Stipulated Judgment
Date: September 06, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 01, 2022Order - ORDER OF CONDEMNATION RE PROJECT PARCEL W-4509
Date: September 06, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: April 10, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 26, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 27, 2023Answer Filed by David Pougatsch (Defendant); Annie Tsai (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by Jacqueline W. Reynolds (Defendant); Stephen D. Reynolds (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: resolution of remaining disputed issues)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JMAC Lending, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. (MERS) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by NEDMAC, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. (MERS) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jacqueline W. Reynolds (Defendant); Stephen D. Reynolds (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by NEDMAC, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application re Prejudgment Possession (c/...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by David Pougatsch (Defendant); Annie Tsai (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Jacqueline W. Reynolds (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by David Pougatsch (Defendant); Annie Tsai (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. (MERS) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Answer Filed by George Jeep-Kung So (Defendant); Jackelyn Hsin-Yi Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by George Jeep-Kung So (Defendant); Jackelyn Hsin-Yi Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JMAC Lending, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: resolution of remaining disputed issues)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 16, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 16, 2020Complaint
Date: November 16, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: November 17, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 17, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 10, 2021Answer
Date: May 11, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: May 12, 2021Answer Filed by NEDMAC, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by JMAC Lending, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, a public entity (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Lis Pendens)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (Defendant Progressive Title Company Inc.'s Declaration of Non-Monetary Status)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Disclaimer (FOR JUNE GORMAN)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (filed not entered-Parcel W-4510 is not a named party in this case.)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Motion re: (for Prejudgment Possession)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice (of Deposits of Profable Compensation)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Order (for Prejudgment Possession)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application re Prejudgment Possession (c/...))
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Prejudgment Possession)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (re Prejudgment Possession)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/10/2021)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order for Prejudgment Possession)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: resolution of remaining disputed issues))
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Prejudgment Possession)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.