Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Holden Beth, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Crissman Jeffery, Etemadi Sophie, against Lindstrom Carl, Paradis Reine, Reininger Benjamin, Reininger Caroline, represented by Bailey William R., Bremer Keith, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael E. Whitaker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael E. Whitaker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 05, 2020 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Reschedule Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Reschedule Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Benjamin Reininger (Defendant); As to: Beth Holden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Benjamin Reininger (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Benjamin Reininger (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-12T00:00:00Notice Notice of Errata; Filed by: Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Benjamin Reininger (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Benjamin Reininger (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Antoine Montini, co-conservator of Marz Holden-Montini (Non-Party)
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Benjamin Reininger (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Benjamin Reininger (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 05, 2020Complaint
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: November 13, 2020PI General Order
Date: December 02, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 15, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 19, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 27, 2021Answer
Date: February 10, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 16, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: July 22, 2021Answer
Date: August 04, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 03, 2022Association of Attorney
Date: October 07, 2022Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: April 10, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 10, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION PETITION TO ADD ANTOINE MONTI...)
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL
Date: April 18, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: April 12, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 21, 2023Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL RECORDS;
Date: April 24, 2023Complaint Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Reine Paradis (Defendant); Carl Lindstrom (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Answer Filed by Benjamin Reininger (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by Benjamin Reininger (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.