Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mcgovern Patrick, Mcgovern Renata, Rp Service Inc. A California Corporation, The Beverly Hills Hamptons Homeowners Associaton A California Corporation, Zakaria Shoshana, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bissell Olivia O, Smythe Michelle, Smythe Michelle J., against Mcgovern Patrick, Mcgovern Renata, Rp Service Inc. A California Corporation, The Beverly Hills Hamptons Homeowners Associaton A California Corporation, represented by Dalmore Jean A., Dunkin Craig L., Hellesen Jon E., Wallace John Craig, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 05, 2020Complaint
Date: November 05, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 05, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: November 13, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 13, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 24, 2020Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: December 07, 2020Answer
Date: December 07, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: December 07, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: December 29, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 29, 2020Answer
Date: December 29, 2020Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: January 22, 2021Answer
Date: January 26, 2021Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 26, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: January 28, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 28, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: January 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 18, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 16, 2021Answer
Date: April 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 23, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: June 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: July 08, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: July 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASES)
Date: August 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE RELATED CASE)
Date: October 06, 2021Answer
Date: November 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED D...)
Date: November 03, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. DUNKIN
Date: November 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE RELATED CASE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SA...)
Date: December 06, 2021Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: February 04, 2022Answer
Date: February 04, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY...)
Date: February 04, 2022Answer
Date: February 10, 2022Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ...)
Date: February 25, 2022Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: March 03, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 03, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 08, 2022Separate Statement
Date: March 08, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: April 19, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: June 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: June 29, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF DINA FORD RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DIMISSAL
Date: August 05, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN C. WALLACE RE OSC RE DISMISSAL
Date: August 05, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: September 13, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: September 14, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: September 27, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: September 28, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: October 13, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by PATRICK MCGOVERN (Defendant); RENATA MCGOVERN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by RP SERVICE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by RP SERVICE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by RP SERVICE, INC., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by SHOSHANA ZAKARIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by PATRICK MCGOVERN (Defendant); RENATA MCGOVERN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by RP SERVICE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Answer Filed by PATRICK MCGOVERN (Defendant); RENATA MCGOVERN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by PATRICK MCGOVERN (Defendant); RENATA MCGOVERN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Complaint Filed by YAMIN ZAKARIA (Plaintiff); SHOSHANA ZAKARIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by PATRICK MCGOVERN (Defendant); RENATA MCGOVERN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by RP SERVICE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of any unserved defendants/...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by YAMIN ZAKARIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by PATRICK MCGOVERN (Defendant); RENATA MCGOVERN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by PATRICK MCGOVERN (Defendant); RENATA MCGOVERN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by YAMIN ZAKARIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by THE BEVERLY HILLS HAMPTONS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATON, a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by YAMIN ZAKARIA (Plaintiff); SHOSHANA ZAKARIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF DINA FORD RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DIMISSAL) Filed by SHOSHANA ZAKARIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal of cross-complaint filed by...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by RP SERVICE, INC., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by YAMIN ZAKARIA (Plaintiff); SHOSHANA ZAKARIA (Plaintiff)
Date: September 28, 2022Answer Filed by THE BEVERLY HILLS HAMPTONS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATON, a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Related Case; Order to Show Cause Re: Sa...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial or, in the ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by YAMIN ZAKARIA (Plaintiff); SHOSHANA ZAKARIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Fo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by YAMIN ZAKARIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal of cross-complaint filed by...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Related Cases) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by YAMIN ZAKARIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by YAMIN ZAKARIA (Plaintiff); SHOSHANA ZAKARIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by YAMIN ZAKARIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by PATRICK MCGOVERN (Cross-Defendant); RENATA MCGOVERN (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (THE BEVERLY HILLS HAMPTONS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Craig L. Dunkin)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF COURT S ORDER RE: RELATED CASES; AND NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Related Cases))
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Related Case; Order to Show Cause Re: Sa...))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re Related Case) of 10/06/2021)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of any unserved defendants/...))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed D...))
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Related Cases) of 08/17/2021)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Related Case) of 07/08/2021)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Related Case))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON NON- APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED DOES/ROES)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Motion to Continue (Trial)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal of cross-complaint filed by...))
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial or, in the ...))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal of cross-complaint filed by...))
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.