Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DWAIN LAMMEY VS WILSHIRE SUITE HOTEL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION;
On November 05, 2020 a civil rights/discrimination (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 05, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 17, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Civil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Intentional Torts
Status
Removal
Overview
Causes of Action
Complaint For Damages And
Injunctive Relief For
Violations Of: Americans With
Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil
Rights Act
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Gregory Keosian |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | The case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Case is Deemed Complete. | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Gregory Keosian |
|
March 12, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on
Judge: Gregory Keosian |
|
March 12, 2021 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on
Judge: Gregory Keosian |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Notice to Clerk of the Superior Court and to Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action to the U.S. District Court; Filed by: Wilshire Suite Hotel, Inc., a California Corporation; (Defendant) |
|
December 30, 2020 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO CLERK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT AND TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT | ||
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice to Clerk of the Superior Court and to Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action to the U.S. District Court) Filed by Wilshire Suite Hotel, Inc., a California Corporation; (Defendant) Filed by Wilshire Suite Hotel, Inc., a California Corporation; (Defendant) |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff); As to: Wilshire Suite Hotel, Inc., a California Corporation; (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
November 30, 2020 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff) Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff) |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Address for Russell Handy (Attorney) updated | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Russell Handy (Attorney): Name Suffix: blank | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 24, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61
Judge: Gregory Keosian |
|
November 24, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61
Judge: Gregory Keosian |
|
November 24, 2020 | Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service | ||
November 24, 2020 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff); As to: Wilshire Suite Hotel, Inc., a California Corporation; (Defendant) |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff); As to: Wilshire Suite Hotel, Inc., a California Corporation; (Defendant) |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff); As to: Wilshire Suite Hotel, Inc., a California Corporation; (Defendant) |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 05, 2020 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
November 05, 2020 | Complaint | ||
November 05, 2020 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
November 05, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff) Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff) |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff) Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff) |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff) |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff) |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff) |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff) |
|