Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Miller Gregory, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Parmet Matthew S, against Frahm An Individual Kevin John, Wolfe Trucking Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Nick Jack, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael E. Whitaker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Gregory Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Gregory Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Consolidate Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: November 05, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 05, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 05, 2020PI General Order
Date: December 02, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 04, 2021Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: September 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES)
Date: February 16, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: April 28, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Gregory Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Gregory Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Not entered, Must be filed under LEAD case) Filed by Gregory Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Gregory Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Gregory Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Gregory Miller (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Gregory Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Consolidate Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation to Consolidate Cases) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of )
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Consolidate Cases))
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation to Consolidate Cases) of )
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.