Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Villatoro Juan Amilcar, Villatoro Zonia, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Miller Karen Barbara, against Balam Angela, represented by Drake Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Monica Bachner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryDefamation (Slander/Libel) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 30, 2020Complaint
Date: October 30, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 30, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 30, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 05, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 11, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 11, 2021Answer
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: February 19, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 08, 2021Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: November 04, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF MEGAN VALLES
Date: November 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, ANGELA BALAM, FOR AN ORDER...)
Date: November 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING STATUS OF PROCEEDING AS TO COUNSEL)
Date: January 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFENDANT, ANGELA BALAM, TO DISQUALIFY KAREN BARBAR...)
Date: February 24, 2022Order - RULING
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REPRESENTATION)
Date: March 24, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 29, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: April 11, 2022Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Zonia Villatoro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Juan Amilcar Villatoro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Juan Amilcar Villatoro (Plaintiff); Zonia Villatoro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Declaration of Megan Valles; Filed by: Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Juan Amilcar Villatoro (Plaintiff); Zonia Villatoro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Juan Amilcar Villatoro (Plaintiff); Zonia Villatoro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Megan Valles) Filed by Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Regarding Status of Proceeding as to Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Juan Amilcar Villatoro (Plaintiff); Zonia Villatoro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Regarding Plaintiff's Representation)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendant, Angela Balam, for an Order...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Juan Amilcar Villatoro (Plaintiff); Zonia Villatoro (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel Filed by Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Juan Amilcar Villatoro (Plaintiff); Zonia Villatoro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Defendant, Angela Balam, to Disqualify Karen Barbar...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Juan Amilcar Villatoro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Juan Amilcar Villatoro (Plaintiff); As to: Angela Balam (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Ruling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Karen Miller
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendant, Angela Balam, for an Order...))
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Megan Valles)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Regarding Status of Proceeding as to Counsel))
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Defendant, Angela Balam, to Disqualify Karen Barbar...))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY KAREN MILLER;)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.