Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pier Lawrence, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Burrill Bethany Renee, Grossman Brian M., against Anahit Harutyunyan An Individual And Co-Trustee Of The Mirian G. Vartapetyan And Anahit Harutyunyan Living Trust Dated June 5 2017, Cohasett Capital Llc, Excelling Inc., Harutyunyan Anahit, Luxe Time Line Inc., (total of 9) See All represented by Green Andrew Scott, Kelly Patrick William, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2020 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Motion to Seal Records; Filed by: GCF Valuation Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mirian Vartapetyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: December 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARI...)
Date: February 27, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: March 03, 2023Separate Statement
Date: March 10, 2023Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: March 10, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/20/2023
Date: March 20, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 20, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 22, 2023Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL RECORDS
Date: April 10, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 10, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 03, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 10, 2023Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: February 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RELEASE OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION
Date: March 17, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 19, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: March 22, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 22, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/30/2021
Date: March 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 01, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 19, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 02, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 03, 2021Answer
Date: August 23, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: August 23, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Release of Notice of Pendency of Action) Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st)) Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mirian Vartapetyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel) Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Case Management Conference) Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lawrence Pier (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Release of Notice of Pendency of Action)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/30/2021)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/01/2021)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Reply (Defendants? Reply in Support of Their Demurrer to Plaintiff?s First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.