Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bridges Montgomery, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Brown Robert, Vakili Sa'Id, against City Of Los Angeles, represented by Jones Heather Elayne, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Monica Bachner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); As to: Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Montgomery Bridges; Filed by: Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 15, 2020Complaint
Date: October 15, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 15, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 11, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES MONTGOMERY BRIDGES
Date: January 11, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 11, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 26, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: February 02, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 02, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: May 27, 2021Order - RULING
Date: May 27, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: May 27, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 23, 2021Answer
Date: June 04, 2021Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: January 10, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 28, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Demurrer of Defendant, City of Los Angeles, to Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendant, City of Los Angeles, Actin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (Montgomery Bridges) Filed by Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Ruling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Montgomery Bridges (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION OF HEATHER E. JONES (CCP SECTION 430.41(a)(2)))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (Montgomery Bridges)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 05/27/2021)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Demurrer of Defendant, City of Los Angeles, to Complaint))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.