Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Merida Douglas, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Tamer Steven, against Njr Three Properties Llc A California Limited Liability Company, represented by Hickman Frederick James, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with James C. Chalfant presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames C. Chalfant Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (RE: TRO)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Case Managemen...))
Date: February 23, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Reply (re Opposition to Preliminary Injunction; Declarations of Steven Tamer)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Response (RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT NJR THREE PROPERTIES TO OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Order (Re: Ex Parte TRO)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (RE: TRO)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Decision on application for preliminary injunction: denied
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Response (Appendix of Evidence in Support of Opposition to OSC re: Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application RE: TRO))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: March 15, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.