Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
5959 Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Hpt Ihg 2 Properties Trust A Maryland Corporation, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Deutsch Joel D., against Hpt Ihg 2 Properties Trust A Maryland Corporation, represented by Coe Lisa Anne, Lombardi Thomas Eriberto, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Theresa M. Traber presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheresa M. Traber Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2020 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HPT IHG 2 Properties Trust, a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Lisa Anne Coe (Attorney)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: HPT IHG 2 Properties Trust, a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: 5959 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: 5959 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by HPT IHG 2 Properties Trust, a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by 5959 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by 5959 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by HPT IHG 2 Properties Trust, a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by 5959 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by HPT IHG 2 Properties Trust, a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Lisa Anne Coe (Attorney)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by 5959 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: November 29, 2021Association of Attorney Filed by HPT IHG 2 Properties Trust, a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protective) Filed by 5959 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by 5959 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by 5959 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by HPT IHG 2 Properties Trust, a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by HPT IHG 2 Properties Trust, a Maryland Corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by HPT IHG 2 Properties Trust, a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by 5959 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by 5959 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by HPT IHG 2 Properties Trust, a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: HPT IHG 2 Properties Trust, a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Dates, Summ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by 5959 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Mediation Status Conference; Final Status Conference and Trial Dates)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice (Supplemental Briefing For Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Status Report (IN ADVANCE OF MARCH 2, 2021 CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protective)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.