Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Guzman Gladys, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Gbewonyo Aaron Godson, Madjidi Mahru, Nguyen Anthony, Shegerian Carney Richard, against Asher Patrick, Piercing Pagoda, Signet Jewelers, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Walizedeh Al, (total of 9) See All represented by Hoffman Jocelyn Marie, Mccormick Thomas N., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 26, 2021Stipulation - No Order Stipulation to Dismiss Certain Defs; Filed by: Gladys Guzman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 26, 2021Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Zales Delaware Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Gladys Guzman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gladys Guzman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jocelyn Marie Hoffman (Attorney)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice of CMC; Filed by: Gladys Guzman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT RECORDS; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 29, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 05, 2020Complaint
Date: October 05, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 05, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 05, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: October 28, 2020Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: November 25, 2020Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS
Date: December 09, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE
Date: December 16, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: January 26, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CMC
Date: January 26, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 26, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/28/2021
Date: January 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 28, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 08, 2021Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFS
Date: February 08, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUANCE
Date: February 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)
Date: February 22, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: February 26, 2021Request for Refund / Order
Date: March 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 09, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE
Date: March 09, 2021Notice of Outgoing Transfer
Date: March 26, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 11, 2021Receipt for Transmitted Record
Date: March 26, 2021Stipulation - No Order (Stipulation to Dismiss Certain Defs)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice (of CMC)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance) of 02/22/2021)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Transfer Venue)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Stipulation to Dismiss Certain Defendants)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Proposed Order)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/28/2021)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Transfer Venue)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUANCE)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.