Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Talavera Isidro, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Reyes Jorge H., against Aerotec Alloys Inc., Hypertherm Inc. A New Hampshire Corporation, represented by Burns George S., Smith Ann, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: September 30, 2020Complaint
Date: September 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 30, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 30, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 19, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 26, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 26, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 03, 2021Answer
Date: March 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 03, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 13, 2021Case Management Order
Date: April 13, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 29, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR AN EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION TO FILE RES...)
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: February 04, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 14, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff)
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Joint Stipulation for an Extension to File Res...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff); As to: AEROTEC ALLOYS, INC., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff); As to: AEROTEC ALLOYS, INC., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: AEROTEC ALLOYS, INC., (Defendant); As to: Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: AEROTEC ALLOYS, INC., (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: AEROTEC ALLOYS, INC., (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by AEROTEC ALLOYS, INC., (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by AEROTEC ALLOYS, INC., (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Isidro Talavera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by AEROTEC ALLOYS, INC., (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.