Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
24 Hour Fitness Usa Inc., Vallejo Gilbert, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Cronk Anna H, Kattan-Wright Seri Nicolas, Greenslade Michael Vincent, against 24 Hour Fitness United States Inc., 24 Hour Fitness Usa Inc., 24 Hour Fitness Worldwide Inc., Aea Investors Lp, Fitness Capital Partners Lp, (total of 5) See All represented by Nick Jack, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Gilbert Vallejo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 22, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 22, 2020Complaint
Date: September 22, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2020PI General Order
Date: October 08, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 17, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: December 07, 2020Answer
Date: December 07, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 08, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY DISCHARGE
Date: March 02, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: September 03, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT 24 HOUR FITNESS...)
Date: November 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; STATUS CONFE...)
Date: November 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; STATUS CONFE...)
Date: November 30, 2021Complaint
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Defendant 24 Hour Fitness...))
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Defendant 24 Hour Fitness...))
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Defendant 24 Hour Fitness...))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Bankruptcy Discharge)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Status Confe...))
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.