Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Figueroa Jennifer, Hammonds Joshua, Morales Ginger, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Aiwazian Arby, Aiwazian Edwin, Boyadjian Aram, Zabehi Tara, Cottrell Carolyn Hunt, (total of 7) See All against Porto'S Bakery Buena Park Inc., Porto'S Bakery & Cafe, Porto'S Bakery Downey Inc, Porto'S Bakery Inc., represented by Evans James Robert Jr, Wright Ian A., Owen Kaitlin Hanigan, Wong Kelsey Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1970 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Ginger Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: July 15, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Report - Complex
Date: July 07, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 11, 2020Complaint
Date: September 11, 2020Initial Status Conference Order
Date: September 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)
Date: September 29, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: October 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 01, 2020Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: December 10, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: December 10, 2020Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: January 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 14, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: January 14, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: January 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: January 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 19, 2021Case Management Order
Date: February 19, 2021Answer
Date: March 19, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CONTINUANCE;)
Date: February 14, 2022Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: REQUEST FOR IDC
Date: April 04, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Report - Complex
Date: July 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: July 14, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: July 27, 2022Association of Attorney - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: September 02, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: December 02, 2022Status Report - STATUS REPORT JOINT
Date: January 09, 2023Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE REMOTE
Date: January 11, 2023Unknown - SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: January 20, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 17, 2023Answer - DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: April 24, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Appearance Case Review |
|
April 24, 2023 | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service | ||
April 24, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE) | ||
February 22, 2023 | Answer - DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT | ||
January 24, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Appearance Case Review |
|
January 20, 2023 | Unknown - SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES | ||
January 17, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE) | ||
January 17, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Status Conference |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Status Report Joint: As To Parties: | |
January 11, 2023 | Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE REMOTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.