Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Med Equity Llc A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Badkar Dinesh Ravindra, Baker Christian E, Marshack Adrianne, Baker Christian E., against Jilanchi Saman, Plm Loan Management Services Inc. A California Corporation, Qwan Capital Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Qwan International Investments Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Top Division Escrow Inc. A California Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Goldstein Jason Edward, Woods Dan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with David J. Cowan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid J. Cowan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management80 days |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 14, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Med Equity LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Med Equity LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Ruling: November 23, 2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Top Division Escrow, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Top Division Escrow, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Order Re: Ruling on Order to Show Re: Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Top Division Escrow, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Qwan Capital LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Saman Jilanchi (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Med Equity LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice Amended Notice of Continued Case Management Conference; Filed by: Saman Jilanchi (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Med Equity LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE WITH 20STCV26093 DEPT 45 IS LEAD CASE
Date: September 04, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 08, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 08, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: September 08, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 14, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 14, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 14, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 08, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: October 08, 2020Answer
Date: October 22, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ADVANCEMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 03, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ADVANCEMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) ,FIL...)
Date: November 23, 2020Order - RULING: NOVEMBER 23, 2020
Date: November 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 12/09/2020
Date: December 09, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/09/2020
Date: December 09, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 17, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ADRIANNE MARSHACK IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: December 17, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOSHUA PUKINI IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: December 17, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: December 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, MED EQUITY, LLC, FOR: 1) ...)
Date: December 21, 2020Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: December 21, 2020Order - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED
Date: December 21, 2020Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS 1 – 36 TO DECLARATION OF SAMAN JILANCHI
Date: December 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST THE HONORABLE SAM...)
Date: December 21, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 29, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 05, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF JOSHUA PUKINI
Date: January 05, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 13, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 20, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 20, 2021Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 25, 2021Order - ORDER RE: RULING ON ORDER TO SHOW RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: January 28, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 28, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING OF BOND
Date: February 05, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/08/2021
Date: February 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: February 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 08, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 10, 2021Objection - OBJECTION [EVIDENTIARY] TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RYAN YOUNG ISO UNDERTAKING UNDER CCP 529
Date: February 10, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK M. SCOTT ISO MOTION OBJECTING TO UNDERTAKINGS
Date: February 10, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 10, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE UNDERTAKING UNDER CCP 529
Date: February 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTIN...)
Date: February 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING OF UNDERTAKING
Date: February 18, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO AFFIDAVIT OF RYAN YOUNG ISO UNDERTAKING UNDER CCP SECTION 529
Date: February 19, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 19, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO AFFIDAVIT OF JOSHUA PUKINI ISO UNDERTAKING UNDER CCP SECTION 529
Date: February 19, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 19, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 24, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION OBJECTING TO UNDERTAKINGS
Date: February 26, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOSHUA PUKINI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION
Date: February 26, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION OBJECTING TO UNDERTAKINGS
Date: March 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OBJECTING TO UNDERTAKINGS)
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: March 10, 2021Order - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DISSOLVE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: March 23, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 23, 2021Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: April 05, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 17, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 30, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 17, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: November 18, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: August 22, 2022Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Related Case (with 20STCV26093 dept 45 is lead case)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Declaration (PLM Loan Management Services, Inc.'s Declaration of Non-Monetary Status)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice (OF ADVANCEMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Jason E. Goldstein Regarding Compliance with Code of Civil Procedure Section 430.41)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) ,Fil...))
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Ruling: November 23, 2020
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice (OF ADVANCEMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON DEMURRER TO JANUARY 15, 2020)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/09/2020)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 12/09/2020)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Adrianne Marshack in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Joshua Pukini in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order to Show Cause why Preliminary Injunction Should not be Entered)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff, Med Equity, LLC, for: 1) ...))
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should not be Entered
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge Against the Honorable Sam...))
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (as to Judge Jessner)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Joshua Pukini in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (EXHIBITS 1 ? 36 TO DECLARATION OF SAMAN JILANCHI)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Objection (TO THE DECLARATION OF JOSHUA PUKINI)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Objection ([Evidentiary] to the Affidavit of Joshua Pukini ISO Undertaking Under CCP 529)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Objection ([Evidentiary] to the Affidavit of Ryan Young ISO Undertaking Under CCP 529)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Mark M. Scott ISO Motion Objecting to Undertakings)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Specially Settin...))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice (of Filing of Bond)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Foreclosure During Pendency of Action)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Motion re: ([Corrected] Notice of Motion and Motion Objecting to Plaintiff's Undertaking)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Objection (DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ADRIANNE E. MARSHACK)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Order (Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Foreclosure During Pendency of Action)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/08/2021)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Order (Re: Ruling on Order to Show Re: Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Dissolve Preliminary Injun...))
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Objection (to Affidavit of Joshua Pukini ISO Undertaking under CCP Section 529)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion Objecting to Undertakings)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Joshua Pukini in Support of Opposition)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Filing of Undertaking)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice (of Approval of Application for Issuance of Preliminary Injunction Bond)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Mark Scott ISO Motion Objecting to Sufficiency of Pltf's Undertakings)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Motion re: (Objecting to Sufficiency of Plaintiff's Undertakings Under CCP Section 529, etc.)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Order (Re the Qwan Defendants' Motion Objecting to Sufficiency of Plaintiff's Undertakings)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON MOTION OBJECTING TO UNDERTAKINGS)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Objecting to Undertakings))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Objection (to Affidavit of Ryan Young ISO Undertaking under CCP Section 529)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Dissolve Preliminary Injun...))
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice (Undertaking Under CCP 529)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.