Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sunwoo Christine, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Szabo Gabor, against Mci Morales Incorporated A California Corporation, Morales Candelario, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michael E. Whitaker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 26, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2020Complaint
Date: August 26, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 26, 2020PI General Order
Date: September 14, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 01, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: April 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Christine Sunwoo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Christine Sunwoo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Christine Sunwoo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Christine Sunwoo (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Christine Sunwoo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.