Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lackey Seanna, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Badger Ty, Ghecea Anthony, Goodwin Gregory, Law Offices Of Goodwin & Ghecea, represented by Feldman Kenneth C., Goodwin Gregory J., Zoller Barry, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Barbara Ann Meiers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara Ann Meiers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2020 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Non-Entry of Default; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Seanna Lackey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Transfer) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue; Filed by: Ty Badger (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Seanna Lackey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Clerk's Certification of Reproduced Court Documents; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel; Filed by: Seanna Lackey (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Ghecea (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Returned Receipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order; Notice of Continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 14, 2020Complaint
Date: August 14, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 18, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 17, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 03, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: September 18, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 21, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: September 22, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: September 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT GHECEA'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST THE HONORABLE...)
Date: September 22, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 23, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: September 24, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/25/2020
Date: September 25, 2020Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments - NOTICE OF NON-ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: October 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 25, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF TY BADGER
Date: October 02, 2020Motion to Transfer
Date: October 02, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANTHONY GHECEA
Date: October 02, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY GOODWIN
Date: October 02, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF BARRY ZOLLER
Date: October 02, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: October 02, 2020Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS’ REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE
Date: October 30, 2020Motion for Change of Venue
Date: November 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE)
Date: November 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE
Date: November 10, 2020Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER)
Date: November 13, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: November 18, 2020Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS
Date: November 25, 2020Receipt for Transmitted Record
Date: November 25, 2020RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD- STANISLAUS COUNTY- CV20005499
Date: December 15, 2020Declaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Clerk's Certification of Reproduced Court Documents
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE AND DECLARATION OF SEANNA LACKEY)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Transfer))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Motion to Transfer
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order; Notice of Continuance) of 11/09/2020)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, AND DECLARATION OF SEANNA LACKEY)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Ghecea's Peremptory Challenge Against the Honorable...))
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Gregory Goodwin)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Transfer) of 11/13/2020)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Non-Entry of Default
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order; Notice of Continuance))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Returned Receipt for Transmitted Record- Stanislaus County- CV20005499
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF TY BADGER)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Barry Zoller)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/25/2020)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Anthony Ghecea)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.