Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
King Leinaia Susan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Korper Rene, against Fca Us Llc, represented by Hanson Erin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Malcolm H. Mackey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Leinaia Susan King (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant); As to: Leinaia Susan King (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Leinaia Susan King (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Leinaia Susan King (Plaintiff)
Date: December 08, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Leinaia Susan King (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 05, 2020Complaint
Date: August 05, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 05, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 27, 2020Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: September 10, 2020Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: September 10, 2020Answer
Date: September 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 21, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 08, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: July 15, 2021Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice (to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court) Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Leinaia Susan King (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Leinaia Susan King (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Leinaia Susan King (Plaintiff)
Date: July 15, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Leinaia Susan King (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by Leinaia Susan King (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Leinaia Susan King (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Leinaia Susan King (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.