Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Alvarado Victor, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Walch Robert, against Guadamuz Ramon Jose, Landjet, Landjet Inc., Landjet Motor Carrier Inc., Landjet Motor Carriers Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Lambre Michelle Monica, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: August 05, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 05, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: January 13, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 30, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 13, 2021Answer
Date: January 13, 2021Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 01, 2021Answer
Date: March 01, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 09, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: August 04, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: March 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: March 25, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: April 01, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Ramon Jose Guadamuz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ramon Jose Guadamuz (Defendant); As to: Victor Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ramon Jose Guadamuz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Landjet (Defendant); Ramon Jose Guadamuz (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Victor Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by Landjet (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Landjet (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Victor Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Ramon Jose Guadamuz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Victor Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Ramon Jose Guadamuz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Victor Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Ramon Jose Guadamuz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Victor Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Victor Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: April 01, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Victor Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Ramon Jose Guadamuz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Landjet (Defendant); As to: Victor Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by Ramon Jose Guadamuz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Victor Alvarado (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Landjet (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.