Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Watson Richard Matthew, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rudorfer David, against Wyatt Jennifer Era, Zinger Kevin E., represented by Isserman Megan A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael E. Whitaker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 05, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 05, 2020PI General Order
Date: August 14, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: September 08, 2020Answer
Date: September 11, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY
Date: March 26, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: December 13, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Richard Matthew Watson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Answer Filed by Kevin E. Zinger (Defendant); Jennifer Era Wyatt (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Richard Matthew Watson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Jennifer Era Wyatt (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Kevin E. Zinger (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Richard Matthew Watson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Richard Matthew Watson (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.