Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lopez Emily, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Amendt Christian J, against Azusa Pacific University, represented by Keough Barbara, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint; Filed by: Emily Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Emily Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Declaration of Trial Attorney; Filed by: Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Azusa Pacific University (Defendant); As to: Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Trial Attorney) Filed by Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: March 17, 2022Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice (of Outcome of Informal Discovery Conference) Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Trial Attorney)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.