Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Roth Steven, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Balice Joseph G, against Behfarin Richard M, Mobasseri Robert, Roth Steven, represented by Balonick Barney, Hughes Iii Albert James, Schreck Raymond, Varma Anurita, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Upinder S. Kalra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Separate Statement
Date: October 27, 2021Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Reply reply in support of demurrer; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration opposing monetary sanctions; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Ruling Re: Demurrer; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Order of Court's Final Ruling; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Ruling Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Declaration of Joseph G. Balice; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Declaration of Joseph G. Balice; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Robert Mobasseri (Appellant)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd); Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff); As to: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-09T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B317916; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-22T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference STATEMENT; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Robert Mobasseri (Defendant); As to: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Ruling Re: Defendant Mobasserri's Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Abandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145; Filed by: Robert Mobasseri (Appellant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Reply Plaintiff's Reply in support of Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff); New Firm Name: BG LAW LLP
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application Ex Paret Application to Continue Trial; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling AT INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Exhibit List JOINT; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-22T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00Reply TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-22T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal B317916; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Management Conference]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Opposition to Steven Roth's Motion In Limine No.1; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO.1; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling RE HEARING ON POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Witness List JOINT; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant); As to: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant); As to: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Richard M Behfarin (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B317916); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Order of Court's Final Ruling; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-10T00:00:00Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE; Filed by: Steven Roth (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/09/2020)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Ruling Re: Demurrer
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Separate Statement ((2714))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Separate Statement ((9425))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Separate Statement ((6652))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Separate Statement ((7299))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Steven Roth in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Joseph G. Balice in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (opposing monetary sanctions)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference Re: Defendant's Represenation; Hearing on M...))
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel FURTHER VERIFIED WRITTEN RESPONSE...))
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (STATEMENT)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply in support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Ruling Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/19/2021)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Ruling Re: Defendant Mobasserri's Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/12/2022)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Post-Mediation Statu...))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/12/2022)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Mo...))
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (STATEMENT REGARDING BEHFARIN DISCOVERY ISSUES)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (DEFENDANT ROBERT MOBASSERI?S INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE STATEMENT)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Status Conference re: Th...))
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AT INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Defendant Ric...))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Richard M. Behfarin's Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Richard M. Behfarin's Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Reply (reply in support of demurrer)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.