Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
California Partners Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Huizenga Robert J., filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Hanigan Tim, against Huizenga Robert J., represented by Myers David A., Walden Richard E., Walden Richard Enoch, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory Keosian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Robert J. Huizenga (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Robert J. Huizenga (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Robert J. Huizenga (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Opposition Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Robert J. Huizenga (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Robert J. Huizenga (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Robert J. Huizenga (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Robert J. Huizenga (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Corrected; Filed by: Robert J. Huizenga (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Robert J. Huizenga (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/02/2020)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Ruling Re Defendant Robert J. Huizenga's Demurrer to the Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Memorandum (of points and Authorities in Opposition To Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (California Partners, LLC)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Ruling Re Defendant Robert J. Huizenga's Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
January 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
December 13, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 20STCV27102 Hearing Date: December 13, 2023 Dept: 61 Defendant Robert J. Huizengas Motions to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories and Requests for Production from Plaintiffs ... | |
October 09, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Further Status Conference |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding Further Status Conference (Re Revival of California Equity Partners, LLC) - Held - Continued Further Status Conference (Re Revival of California Equity Partners, LLC) - Held - Continued Judge: Gregory Keosian |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference Re Revival of California Equity Par...) | |
July 11, 2023 | Hearing | Further Status Conference Re Revival of California Equity Partners, LLC scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 61 Further Status Conference (Re Revival of California Equity Partners, LLC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Further Status Conference (Re Revival of California Equity Partners, LLC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Address for Daniel L Allender (Attorney) updated | |
June 26, 2023 | Hearing | On the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference Re Revival of California Equity Partners, LLC scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.