Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Rose Andre V. Dba Vision Gc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Riley Kevin E, Riley Kevin E., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Monica Bachner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonica Bachner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateJuly 10, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJune 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 10, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 10, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 10, 2020Complaint
Date: July 10, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 13, 2020Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 31, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 12, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE)
Date: April 15, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: July 09, 2021Case Management Statement; Filed by: Andre V. Rose (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Andre V. Rose (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Andre V Rose (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Andre V. Rose (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Regarding Default Judgment Package) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff, Andre V. Rose dba Vision G...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference Regarding Default Judgment Package) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Andre V. Rose (Plaintiff)
Date: July 09, 2021Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Andre V. Rose (Plaintiff)
Date: July 12, 2021Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Default entered as to Kevin E Riley; On the Complaint filed by Andre V Rose on
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Andre V. Rose (Plaintiff)
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Regarding Why $500 Sanctions Should not b...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Andre V. Rose (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Regarding Default Judgment Package)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Andre V Rose (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin E Riley (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Andre V. Rose (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Andre V. Rose (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Monetary Sanctions Should not be ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 11/12/2020)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Regarding Default Judgment Package) of 04/15/2021)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Monetary Sanctions Should not be ...))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff, Andre V. Rose dba Vision G...))
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Regarding Default Judgment Package))
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.