Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Studio 35K Productions Inc., filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Katrinak Raymond Paul, Kernan Stephen Michael, against Hudson Bill, The Truman Van Dyke Company, represented by Gomez Charles G., Herme Lisa, Klier-Erlich Rinat, Mckinnon Ashton Leslie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark V. Mooney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2020 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Bill Hudson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Bill Hudson (Defendant); The Truman Van Dyke Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: The Truman Van Dyke Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Bill Hudson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Declaration of S. Michael Kernan re Joint Report; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Bill Hudson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: July 02, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 02, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 07, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 23, 2020Answer
Date: August 28, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 21, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: October 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: November 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: November 05, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/12/2020
Date: November 12, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF S. MICHAEL KERNAN RE: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: November 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 08, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 08, 2020Separate Statement
Date: January 21, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: January 20, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 21, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: January 25, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: January 28, 2021Separate Statement
Date: January 28, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: February 10, 2021Separate Statement
Date: February 11, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: March 15, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: March 22, 2021Status Report - STATUS REPORT - JOINT REPORT
Date: March 24, 2021Exhibit List
Date: March 24, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: March 24, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 02, 2021Objection - OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO IMPROPER SURREPLY FILED BY DEFENDANTS
Date: April 07, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 07, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING RE MULTIPLE DISCOVERY MOTIONS
Date: April 27, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 04, 2021Status Report
Date: May 04, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 05, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME
Date: May 05, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 06, 2021Order - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER ON REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION
Date: May 06, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Bill Hudson (Defendant); The Truman Van Dyke Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Bill Hudson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Bill Hudson (Defendant); The Truman Van Dyke Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Bill Hudson (Defendant); The Truman Van Dyke Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Bill Hudson (Defendant); The Truman Van Dyke Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Bill Hudson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Ex Parte; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Bill Hudson (Defendant); The Truman Van Dyke Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Bill Hudson (Defendant); The Truman Van Dyke Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order - ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 06, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS HEARD ON MAY 6, 2021
Date: May 14, 2021Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: May 19, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: June 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT)
Date: June 30, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: July 01, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: August 16, 2021Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPERLY COMBINED MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPERLY COMBINED MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Separate Statement (IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPERLY COMBINED MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Ex Parte)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Reply to Opposition to Ex Parte)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for and Order Combining Motion Dates)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Ex Parte)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for and Order Com...))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for and Order Combining Motio...))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Fur...))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Suzanne Onuki 13734)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/08/2021)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Fur...))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiff's Motion)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Status Report (- JOINT REPORT)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on The Trum...))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Cesar Rodriguez 13269)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Reply (to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Set One Admitted)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Cesar Rodrighez 13269)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Objection (and Response to Improper Surreply filed by Defendants)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Reply (to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Order (Granting Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Declaration (of S. Michael Kernan re Joint Report)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Objection (TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING RE MULTIPLE DISCOVERY MOTIONS)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (of Defendants For Order Advancing Hearing Date On Motion For Protective Order)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Deborah Morin)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling on Discovery Motions Heard on May 6, 2021)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Order (on Plaintiff's Motion for Order on Requests for Admission)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Order (on Motion to Compel Response to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling on Motion for Leave to Amend)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: February 08, 2021Separate Statement
Date: February 08, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: February 09, 2021Separate Statement
Date: February 09, 2021Separate Statement
Date: February 10, 2021Complaint
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Answer (Amended answer)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/12/2020)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of S. Michael Kernan re: Case Management Statement)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Without Objections, To Form Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Mark V. Mooney |
|
January 24, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
January 24, 2022 | Hearing | ||
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Mark V. Mooney |
|
January 14, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
January 14, 2022 | Hearing | Final Status Conference | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Mark V. Mooney |
|
December 07, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment | |
August 17, 2021 | Hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
August 17, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68 Not Held - Vacated by Court on |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.