Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dykema Llp A California Limited Liability Partnership Aka "Dykema Gossett Llp", filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Markolf Beau, Markolf Max, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Curtis A. Kin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCurtis A. Kin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership on
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 30, 2020Complaint
Date: June 30, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 30, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: July 02, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: July 07, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 14, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 26, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: November 03, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 05, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 05, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 16, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF COLLIN SEALS ISO APPLICATION TO SERVE BY PUBLICATION
Date: December 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 17, 2020Application for Publication
Date: December 14, 2020Order for Publication
Date: January 05, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
Date: February 16, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 14, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 26, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: April 16, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: May 10, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 12, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: July 08, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 08, 2021Brief - BRIEF INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: August 02, 2021Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ALL DOE DEFENDANTS ONLY
Date: August 02, 2021Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT
Date: August 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 19, 2021Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Default Judgment (By Court) Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Order for Publication Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Application for Publication Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: peremptory challenge to judicial officer;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Dykema, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Collin Seals in support of Default Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: peremptory challenge to judicial officer;))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: peremptory challenge to judicial officer;) of 07/07/2020)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Collin Seals ISO Application to Serve by Publication)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiff's Statement per Rule 3.1800 re Interest and Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Jon D. Cantor in support of Default Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Brief (Index of Exhibits in support of Request for Default Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.