Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Los Angeles A Municipal Corporation, Southern California Gas Company A California Corporation, West 43Rd Place Llc A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Hussain Muhammed T., Kaplan Michael Steven, Kehoe Michael I., Karczag Justin P., against City Of Los Angeles A Municipal Corporation, Does 1 Through 20 Inclusive, Southern California Gas Company A California Corporation, represented by Shemtoob Pejmon, Williams Cranston J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management161 days |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions91 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: WEST 43RD PLACE, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: WEST 43RD PLACE, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: January 07, 2021Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: January 20, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: January 21, 2021Answer
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 25, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 09, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE
Date: April 19, 2021Answer
Date: April 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 23, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 18, 2021Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: July 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 06, 2021Case Management Order
Date: July 06, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 23, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: September 14, 2022Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: November 09, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 29, 2022Separate Statement
Date: December 29, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ALLAN DICASTRO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE
Date: January 11, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL KEHOE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE FOR TRO
Date: January 13, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: January 25, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL REL...)
Date: February 10, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING FOR THE CITY’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 09, 2023Complaint
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Reply (City of Los Angeles' Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of 09/21/2020)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant City of Los Angeles' Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Ruling Re Defendant City of Los Angeles Demurrer to the Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of City of Los Angeles' Demurrer)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.