Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company A Corporation, filed a(n) Declaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Beaton Julie, against Cruz Israel, Hovasapyan Vazrik, Sarkisian Edit, Tarverdi Larisa, Uribe Evangelina Aka Eva Uribe, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Rupert A. Byrdsong presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 19, 2020 |
CategoryDeclaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Evangelina Uribe (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Evangelina Uribe (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Israel Cruz (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Israel Cruz (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Evangelina Uribe (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Israel Cruz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Evangelina Uribe (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 19, 2022Notice of Ruling; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 19, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 19, 2020Complaint
Date: June 19, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 19, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 26, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: July 31, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 01, 2020Answer
Date: July 31, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 24, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 06, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 14, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 19, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 28, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 20, 2020Application for Publication
Date: December 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: December 21, 2020Order for Publication
Date: January 05, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 23, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 23, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 09, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: April 22, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 23, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL-RELATED DATES
Date: April 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: October 21, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: June 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT LARISA TARVERDI
Date: May 13, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: June 08, 2022Notice - NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL
Date: July 11, 2022Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: July 20, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 15, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: August 15, 2022Application - APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS
Date: September 07, 2022Judgment
Date: October 19, 2022Default Judgment
Date: October 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: October 19, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: October 19, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2022Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Israel Cruz (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Israel Cruz (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Complaint Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by Israel Cruz (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Israel Cruz (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Evangelina Uribe (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Answer Filed by Evangelina Uribe (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for order striking answers a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Israel Cruz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Evangelina Uribe (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Order for Publication Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Notice (of hearing) Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice (of hearing)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Plaintiff's Informal Discovery Conference Statement
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Declaration (declaration of diligence re service of process on defendant Larisa Tarverdi)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Brief (Joint statement regarding discovery)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice (of entry of default of defendant Larisa Tarverdi)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice (of trial-related dates)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.