Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gautam Prabhat, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Simantob Sam N. Esq., against Airbnb Inc. A Delaware Corporation, Ceravolo Rosemarie Josephine, De Sarro Michael Angelo, Southern California Gas Company A California Corporation, represented by Lamothe Rachel M. Esq., Schrieffer Paul K, Schrieffer Paul K. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jill T. Feeney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Prabhat Gautam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Filed by the Defendants to Co...)
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Prabhat Gautam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-26T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Prabhat Gautam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: June 17, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 17, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 17, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 17, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 25, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 30, 2020Answer
Date: August 04, 2020Answer
Date: August 07, 2020Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE)
Date: August 21, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 14, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: September 01, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: September 07, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 26, 2023Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: April 07, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: April 12, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SAM N. SIMANTOB, ESQ. ISO CONTINUING TRAIL
Date: April 18, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: April 24, 2023Answer Filed by Michael Angelo De Sarro (Defendant); Rosemarie Josephine Ceravolo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Southern California Gas Company, a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Michael Angelo De Sarro (Defendant); Rosemarie Josephine Ceravolo (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Prabhat Gautam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Prabhat Gautam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Prabhat Gautam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Prabhat Gautam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((Partial W/O Prejudice)) Filed by Prabhat Gautam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Prabhat Gautam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Prabhat Gautam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Prabhat Gautam (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((Partial W/O Prejudice))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.