Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Phillips Jessner Llp A California Limited Liability Partnership, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mueller Carl, Mueller Carl I., against Yang Ruiqian Aka Anna Yang, represented by Baker Robert P., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Phillips Jessner LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Ruiqian Yang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Ruiqian Yang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Motion to Vacate Default Judgment; Filed by: Ruiqian Yang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Ruiqian Yang (Defendant)
Date: October 26, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 07, 2020Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR RUIQIAN
Date: October 06, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: November 25, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 14, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: December 17, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 22, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SAMUEL G. FOGAS REGARDING ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: January 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 06, 2021Summary of the Case
Date: February 11, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 05, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/05/2021
Date: March 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: April 07, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT BY COURT, BY DEFAULT
Date: April 07, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: April 14, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: April 16, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: April 15, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (SAN DIEGO)
Date: May 12, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: May 11, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 26, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 27, 2021Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption
Date: July 30, 2021Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim
Date: July 30, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION/THIRD-PARTY CLAIM BY PLAINTIFF)
Date: September 03, 2021Order - ORDER ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION
Date: September 03, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT/ORDER
Date: September 07, 2021Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: September 27, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 27, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION TO VACATE DEFAULT
Date: September 30, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 30, 2021Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT RUIQIAN YANG TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: September 30, 2021Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT RUIQIAN YANG’S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: September 30, 2021Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 30, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF LODGING
Date: October 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: October 15, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 26, 2021Writ - Return
Date: November 30, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/15/2020)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Samuel G. Fogas in Support of Application for Publication)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/12/2020)
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement (by Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Order for Publication (for Ruiqian)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((SAN DIEGO))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF SAMUEL G. FOGAS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Judgment (By Default)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Relief from Default and Default Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Relief from Default and D...))
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/05/2021)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF SAMUEL G. FOGAS REGARDING ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Motion for Relief from Default and Default Judgment)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Ana Yang in Support of Motion to Vacate Default and Default Judgment -[Res ID: _4183])
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Answer (of Defendant Ruiqian Yang to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER ON DEPOSIT ACCOUNT ...))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling ((Date: 08/26/2021))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR ORDER ON DEPOSIT ACCOUNT EXEMPTION)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim by Plaintiff))
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling ((Date: 07/27/2021))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Default and Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Ana Yang in Support of Motion for Relief From Default and Default/Judgment)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice (of Lodging [Proposed] Cross-Complaint -[Hrg: 10/14/2021])
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling ((Date: 07/23/2021))
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Order (Order Determining Claim of Exemption)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment/Order)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim by Plaintiff))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim ((Date: 08/26/2021))
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (Default and Default Judgment -[Res ID: _4183])
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Other - (Claim of Exemption Packet-Cover Sheet)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement ((P))
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Other - Claim of Exemption Packet-Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ruiqian Yang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Phillips Jessner LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Declaration to Vacate Default; Filed by: Ruiqian Yang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Phillips Jessner LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Ruiqian Yang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Phillips Jessner LLP, a California limited liability partnership on
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.