Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fritz Betty, Fritz Robert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Harber Stephen M., against Los Angeles County Bicycle Coalition, Zubiri Martin, represented by Gibbs Patrick Joseph, Lee David, Moore Stephen Ward, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: December 11, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 11, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 14, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFFS TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT MARTIN ZUBIRI
Date: December 31, 2020Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 07, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 22, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: February 03, 2021Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 01, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: March 03, 2021Request for Refund / Order
Date: March 03, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 22, 2021Amended Complaint - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 11, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: May 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: December 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: January 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: February 25, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: March 22, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Martin Zubiri (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Martin Zubiri (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Robert Fritz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY BICYCLE COALITION (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY BICYCLE COALITION (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY BICYCLE COALITION (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Martin Zubiri (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY BICYCLE COALITION (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY BICYCLE COALITION (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY BICYCLE COALITION (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Reply reply to plaintiffs opposition to demurrer to complaint; Filed by: Martin Zubiri (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY BICYCLE COALITION (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Los Angeles County Bicycle Coalition's Demurrer to Plaintiff...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY BICYCLE COALITION (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) Filed by Martin Zubiri (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Robert Fritz (Plaintiff); Betty Fritz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Robert Fritz (Plaintiff); Betty Fritz (Plaintiff)
Date: March 22, 2022Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Los Angeles County Bicycle Coalition's Demurrer to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY BICYCLE COALITION (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Reply (reply to plaintiffs opposition to demurrer to complaint) Filed by Martin Zubiri (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Robert Fritz (Plaintiff); Betty Fritz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Robert Fritz (Plaintiff); Betty Fritz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Martin Zubiri (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed by Robert Fritz (Plaintiff); Betty Fritz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY BICYCLE COALITION (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Robert Fritz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Robert Fritz (Plaintiff); Betty Fritz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Robert Fritz (Plaintiff); Betty Fritz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY BICYCLE COALITION (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY BICYCLE COALITION (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Martin Zubiri (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Martin Zubiri (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Opposition (BY PLAINTIFFS TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT MARTIN ZUBIRI)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Los Angeles County Bicycle Coalition's Demurrer to ...))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Reply (reply to plaintiffs opposition to demurrer to complaint)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT;)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Los Angeles County Bicycle Coalition's Demurrer to Plaintiff...))
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 22, 2020Complaint
Date: May 22, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 22, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 22, 2020PI General Order
Date: May 26, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 22, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: November 25, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 11, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.