Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Freshtech A California Corporation, Keller Scott M., Mir Nazir, Mirtech Inc. A New Jersey Corporation, Ross Joseph, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Goldsobel Steven M., Goldsobel Steven Matthew, Khosravirad Vandad, against Applications Technologies Inc., Freshtech A California Corporation, Keller Packaging Group Inc., Keller Scott M., Mir Nazir, (total of 6) See All represented by Annigian Jason David, Augustini Rick, Carlton Daniel Scott, Ryan James, Ryan James Timothy, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Charles C. Lee presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Objection (to Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: August 26, 2022Declaration ISO Temporary Restraining Order; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Notice of Court Order; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Order RULING; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Response to Objection; Filed by: Mirtech, Inc. a New Jersey corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff); As to: Nazir Mir (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Motion for Order Seeking Relief from Waiver of Privileges; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Reply ISO Ex Parte Application for TRO; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Declaration ISO Automatic Extension; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpoena; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Declaration In Support of Motion to Compel; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Declaration ISO Motion to Compel; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Opposition Motion to Compel Subpoena; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Quash Subpoena: Filed By: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Order RULING; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Reply ISO Motion for Order Seeking Relief; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Notice of Court Order; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Declaration Joseph Ross; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Order RULING (on Motion for Sanctions); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Order RULING; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Order RULING (on submitted matter); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Declaration Vandad Khosravirad; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Freshtech, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Keller Packaging Group, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Conditionally Under Seal; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging File Under Seal; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Motion to Seal Documents in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , copy of the Court ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Freshtech, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff); As to: Scott M. Keller (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Freshtech, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Declaration of Scott M. Keller; Filed by: Scott M. Keller (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Declaration of Nazir Mir; Filed by: Nazir Mir (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion [Redacted]; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Order RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Objection to Declaration; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Opposition Motion to Quash Summons; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Lodging and Filing Under Seal; Filed by: Scott M. Keller (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Declaration re Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses; Filed by: Scott M. Keller (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Final Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Declaration of Jennifer M. Millier; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Unredacted Texts; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Conditionally Under Seal; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Reply in Support of Joinder to Motion to Compel Deposition Appearance; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses; Filed by: Scott M. Keller (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Reply ISO Demurrer to Mirtech FAC; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Freshtech, a California corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Declaration ISO Opposition to Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Freshtech, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Freshtech, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Declaration ISO Motion; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Final Ruling-Motion to Quash Freshtech's Subpoena; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Conditionally Under Seal; Filed by: Mirtech, Inc. a New Jersey corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Order RULING (on Demurrer); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Declaration of Era Ulitskaya; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpoena; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration of Steven Goldsobel [Redacted]; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Final Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Opposition Motion to Qush Service of Summons; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Joinder to Motion to Compel Deposition Appearance; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Conditionally Under Seal; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Freshtech, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Mirtech, Inc. a New Jersey corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Opposition to Motion; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration ISO Reply; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-08-28T00:00:00Reply ISO Motion to Compel Keller's Further Responses; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Declaration of Dana Styck; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Reply ISO Motion to Compel Unredacted Texts; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Freshtech, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Motion to Quash - OR MODIFY SUBPOENA
Date: September 01, 2020Separate Statement
Date: September 01, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 02, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 04, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF NAZIR MIR
Date: September 08, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF SCOTT M. KELLER
Date: September 08, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: September 08, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 17, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: September 18, 2020Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA
Date: September 22, 2020Separate Statement
Date: September 22, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION ISO AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: September 24, 2020Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: November 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC) (C/F 11/3 SINCE DARK))
Date: November 16, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION ISO MOTION
Date: November 18, 2020Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER SEEKING RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF PRIVILEGES
Date: November 23, 2020Answer
Date: December 08, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: December 09, 2020Answer
Date: December 09, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: January 11, 2021Separate Statement
Date: January 12, 2021Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: January 12, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: January 19, 2021Separate Statement
Date: January 20, 2021Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA
Date: January 20, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION RE HEARING DATES
Date: January 25, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO JOSEPH ROSS AND ROSS INTERNATIONAL'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION RE HEARING DATES)
Date: January 26, 2021Order - ORDER (GRANTING IN PART EX PARTE)
Date: January 26, 2021Summons - SUMMONS TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 26, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 27, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: January 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION RE DANA STYCK SUBPOENA
Date: January 29, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION MOTION TO COMPEL SUBPOENA
Date: February 05, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: February 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)
Date: February 11, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 11, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF FRESHTEC'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA
Date: February 16, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL THIRD PARTY
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: February 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: February 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA (C/F 12/...)
Date: February 24, 2021Order - ORDER RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER
Date: February 25, 2021Order - ORDER RULING
Date: February 25, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 01, 2021Reply - REPLY ISO MOTION FOR ORDER SEEKING RELIEF
Date: March 04, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION
Date: March 04, 2021Order - ORDER RULING
Date: March 11, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 15, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: March 26, 2021Notice - NOTICE ERRATA
Date: March 26, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 26, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: April 26, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: April 26, 2021Motion for Sanctions
Date: May 21, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION VANDAD KHOSRAVIRAD
Date: June 01, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS
Date: June 01, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 01, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION JOSEPH ROSS
Date: June 01, 2021Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL
Date: June 09, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021Application - APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Date: June 09, 2021Response - RESPONSE TO OBJECTION
Date: June 10, 2021Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Date: June 16, 2021Order - ORDER RULING (ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: June 16, 2021Order - ORDER RULING (ON DEMURRER)
Date: June 16, 2021Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: June 21, 2021Order - ORDER RULING
Date: June 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: June 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 30, 2021Separate Statement
Date: July 21, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: July 28, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 29, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (4TH)
Date: August 19, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: September 09, 2021Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: October 08, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 08, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF SCOTT M. KELLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH
Date: October 08, 2021Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CONDITIONALLY SEALED DOCUMENTS
Date: October 12, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH ROSS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER [REDACTED]
Date: October 12, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION APPENDIX OF THIRD-PARTY DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION
Date: October 27, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Continuance
Date: November 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS)
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING OF NOVEMBER 30, 2021
Date: December 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PUBLICLY EXHIBIT 2 TO THE DECLARATION OF SCOTT M. KELLER
Date: December 13, 2021Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL
Date: December 13, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AND ENTRY OF ORDER ON MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER
Date: January 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROSS, TO APPOINT RECEIVER)
Date: January 06, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: January 13, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 10, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: March 14, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 14, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING FILE UNDER SEAL
Date: March 15, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2022Joinder
Date: March 18, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 28, 2022Order - FINAL RULING-DEMURRER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: April 19, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 22, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 26, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 26, 2022Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: April 26, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF D. SCOTT CARLTON
Date: April 26, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION MOTION TO QUSH SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: May 02, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: May 06, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)
Date: May 13, 2022Order - ORDER FINAL RULING
Date: May 16, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: May 20, 2022Order - ORDER FINAL RULING
Date: May 20, 2022Cross-Complaint
Date: May 26, 2022Unknown - SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: June 17, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 06, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: July 06, 2022Answer
Date: July 18, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: July 19, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 19, 2022Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: July 19, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 19, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 19, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING JOINT REQUEST FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: August 04, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: August 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: August 12, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: August 26, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ROSS AND ROSS INTERNATIONAL'S DEMURRER TO MERITECH'S CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: September 09, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 12, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 12, 2022Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION APPEARANCE
Date: September 12, 2022Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION APPEARANCE
Date: September 15, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 19, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 11, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: October 11, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 11, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: October 11, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF JOINDER TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION APPEARANCE
Date: October 14, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 17, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 24, 2022Order - FINAL RULING- CROSS-DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: October 25, 2022Order - FINAL RULING-DEMURRER TO MIRTECH'S CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 25, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: October 26, 2022Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: October 28, 2022Answer - CROSS-DEFENDANT ROBERT DAVIDUK'S ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: November 03, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 28, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: November 28, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: November 28, 2022Application - APPLICATION FILE UNDER SEAL
Date: November 28, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 30, 2022Separate Statement
Date: February 22, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH MONTOYA
Date: February 22, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: February 22, 2023Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL UNREDACTED TEXTS
Date: February 22, 2023Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING AND FILING UNDER SEAL
Date: February 22, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 22, 2023Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL
Date: February 23, 2023Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL
Date: March 01, 2023Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 03, 2023Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 02, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION ISO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 03, 2023Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SEAL DOCUMENTS
Date: March 03, 2023Notice - NOTICE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS
Date: March 03, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: March 06, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 14, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANA STYCK
Date: March 14, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF UNREDACTED TEXT MESSAGES
Date: March 14, 2023Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING AND FILING UNDER SEAL
Date: March 14, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER M. MILLIER
Date: March 14, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 14, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERA ULITSKAYA
Date: March 14, 2023Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO MONTOYA DECLARATION (REDACTED)
Date: March 14, 2023Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: March 14, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION RE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: March 14, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: March 14, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL THIRD PARTY COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA
Date: March 14, 2023Brief - BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL
Date: March 16, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: March 16, 2023Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION ISO REPLY
Date: March 20, 2023Reply - REPLY ISO MOTION TO COMPEL KELLER'S FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: March 20, 2023Reply - REPLY ISO MOTION TO COMPEL UNREDACTED TEXTS
Date: March 20, 2023Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING AND FILING UNDER SEAL
Date: March 21, 2023Reply - REPLY ISO DEMURRER TO MIRTECH FAC
Date: March 22, 2023Separate Statement
Date: March 24, 2023Objection - OBJECTION TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 22, 2023Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING AND FILING UNDER SEAL
Date: March 24, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 24, 2023Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 24, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 24, 2023Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: March 24, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 21, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 21, 2021Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)
Date: July 27, 2021Order - ORDER RULING (ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: July 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 09, 2021Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL THIRD PARTY MACEIKO IP TO PRODUCE BUSINESS RECORDS
Date: September 10, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 10, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: October 14, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: October 18, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 27, 2021Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STEVEN GOLDSOBEL [REDACTED]
Date: November 02, 2021Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROSS, TO APPOINT RECEIVER; . MOT...)
Date: November 09, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 27, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: March 28, 2023Order - FINAL RULING-DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: March 29, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: March 30, 2023Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 03, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: April 04, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: April 06, 2023Notice of Continuance
Date: April 14, 2023Notice of Continuance
Date: April 24, 2023Declaration ISO Motion to Compel; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Mirtech, Inc. a New Jersey corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Motion to Compel) Filed by Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Final Ruling- Cross-Defendants' Demurrer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Final Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Notice of Court Order) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Keller Packaging Group, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (4th)) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Hearing on Dem...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Keller Packaging Group, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by RPLANET EARTH LOS ANGELES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Final Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Steven Goldsobel [Redacted]) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Joinder to Motion to Compel Deposition Appearance) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Compel Deposition Appearance) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Application (File Under Seal) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Final Ruling-Demurrer to Mirtech's Cross-Complaint Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Unredacted Texts) Filed by Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Conditionally Under Seal) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Temporary Restraining Order) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Reply (ISO Ex Parte Application for TRO) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Order (RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Freshtech, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Automatic Extension) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Freshtech, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Freshtech, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Nazir Mir) Filed by Nazir Mir (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (Joseph Ross) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by ROBERT DAVIDUK (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Compel Subpoena) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order (1) Granting Leave ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Application (to File Under Seal) Filed by Mirtech, Inc. a New Jersey corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (c/f 11/3 since Dark))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Seeking relief from the waiver of...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Order ((granting in part ex parte)) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by ROSS INTERNATIONAL, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Reply (ISO Motion for Order Seeking Relief) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Compliance with Subpoena) Filed by Freshtech, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Freshtech, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Re Hearing Dates) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Re Hearing Dates)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Quash Summons) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Order (RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Order (RULING (on Motion for Sanctions)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File Fourth Amended Complaint) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena (c/f 12/...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Conditionally Under Seal) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Declaration (Vandad Khosravirad) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Order (RULING (on submitted matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order (1) Granting Leave ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROSS, TO APPOINT RECEIVER)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Notice of Court Order) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Order (RULING (on Demurrer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd)) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Order (RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion [Redacted]) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (File Under Seal) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Final Ruling-Demurrer to Fourth Amended Complaint Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROSS, TO APPOINT RECEIVER; . MOT...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Opposition to Motion to Quash Service of Summons) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Mirtech, Inc. a New Jersey corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Order (FINAL RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Scott M. Keller (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Scott M. Keller) Filed by Scott M. Keller (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Conditionally Under Seal) Filed by Mirtech, Inc. a New Jersey corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice (Errata) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Response (to Objection) Filed by Mirtech, Inc. a New Jersey corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Motion for Order (Seeking Relief from Waiver of Privileges) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review to confirm receipt of simultaneous...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Order (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Documents in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF COURT ORDER) Filed by Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Order (FINAL RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , copy of the Court ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Qush Service of Summons) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Answer Filed by ROSS INTERNATIONAL, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Joseph Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROSS, FOR TEMPORARY...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Temporary Restraining Order) Filed by Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion to appoint receiver; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Reply in support of motion to appoint receiver; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Declaration of Ross in support of motion to appoint receiver; Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (Filed Conditionally Under Seal); Filed by: Joseph Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Reply (ISO Ex Parte Application for TRO)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Scott Keller in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protective Order - Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROSS, FOR TEMPORARY...))
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Nazir Mir)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Scott M. Keller)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Notice of Court Order)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Compliance with Subpoena)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Motion for Order (Seeking Relief from Waiver of Privileges)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (c/f 11/3 since Dark)))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Joseph Ross and Ross International's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Re Hearing Dates)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Order ((granting in part ex parte))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Compliance with Subpoena)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Re Hearing Dates))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion re Dana Styck Subpoena)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Summons (TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Freshtec's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Compel Third Party)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Compel Subpoena)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena (c/f 12/...) of )
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena (c/f 12/...))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Notice of Court Order)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Order (RULING)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Order (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Reply (ISO Motion for Order Seeking Relief)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Brief (Defendants' Supplemental Brief re: Defendants' Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review to confirm receipt of simultaneous...))
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order (1) Granting Leave ...))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Order (RULING)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Application for Order Granting Leave to file Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER AWARDING PLAINTIFF FEES AND COSTS RE DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order (1) Granting Leave ...))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Order (RULING (on submitted matter))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (4th))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Application (to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Joseph Ross' Motion to Appoint Receiver)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Third Party Maceiko IP to Produce Business Records)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF JOSEPH ROSS? MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRIAN WEISS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF JOSEPH ROSS MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Scott M. Keller in Support of Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Conditionally Sealed Documents)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOSEPH ROSS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER [REDACTED])
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF COURT ORDER)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Objection (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Steven Goldsobel [Redacted])
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary to Declarations Submitted in Support of Opposition to Motion [Redacted])
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Documents in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Declaration (Appendix of Third-Party Declarations in Support of Opposition)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion [Redacted])
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROSS, TO APPOINT RECEIVER; . MOT...))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (OF NOVEMBER 30, 2021)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (in Support of Applications to File Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Brief (Supplemental Brief in Support of Applications to File Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice (of Filing Publicly Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Scott M. Keller)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AND ENTRY OF ORDER ON MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROSS, TO APPOINT RECEIVER))
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (File Under Seal)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Final Ruling-Demurrer to Fourth Amended Complaint
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Final Ruling)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...))
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons))
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Reply (CROSS-DEFENDANTS? REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections to Evidence)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Opposition to Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Qush Service of Summons)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Opposition (Motion for Judgment of the Pleadings)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Objection (to Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Declaration (OF D. SCOTT CARLTON)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , copy of the Court ruling)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Order (FINAL RULING)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Reply (CROSS-DEFENDANTS? REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Order (FINAL RULING)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Second Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOSEPH N. MONTOYA IN SUPPORT OF CROSSDEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Declaration (re: Dept. 49 Court Orders re: Motions to Compel Further Responses to Discovery)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Proposed First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike Second Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (JOINT REQUEST FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Response (to Mirtech's Objections to Ross and Ross International's RFJN ISO Demurrer to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Final Ruling)
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Cross-Defendant RPlanet Earth Los Angeles Holdings, LLC's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Cross-Defendant Robert Daviduk's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Answer (CROSS-DEFENDANT RPLANET EARTH LOS ANGELES, LLC?S ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Final Ruling-Demurrer to Mirtech's Cross-Complaint
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Conditionally Under Seal Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (CSR: Shawnda R. Dorn/ #11387)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice (Errata)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (Vandad Khosravirad)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Order (RULING)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Seeking relief from the waiver of...))
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Application (to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Quash Summons)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Notice of Motion)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Declaration (Joseph Ross)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF STEVEN GOLDSOBEL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDNATS? MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Reply (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Application (to File Under Seal)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Objection (TO NEWLY SUBMITTED DECLARATION OF NAZIR MIR; REQUEST FOR LEAVE IN THE ALTERNATIVE)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Response (to Objection)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Order (Granting Application to File Under Seal)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Order (Granting Defendants' Application to File Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Hearing on Dem...))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (CSR: Cheri Bullock/ #4714)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Order (RULING (on Demurrer))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Order (RULING (on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Hearing on Dem...) of )
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF D. SCOTT CARLTON RE: COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT?S MINUTE ORDER OF AUGUST 12, 2022)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Ross and Ross International's Demurrer to Meritech's Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Cross-Defendants' Motion to Compel)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Joinder to Motion to Compel Deposition Appearance)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Final Ruling- Cross-Defendants' Demurrer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Declaration (Re: Department 49 Court Orders: Re: Motions to Compel Further Responses to Discovery)
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Compel Deposition Appearance)
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Objection (to Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Joseph Ross and Ross International's Demurrer to Mirtech's Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Deposition Appearance)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Reply (ISO Ex Parte Application for TRO)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROSS, FOR TEMPORARY...))
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Scott Keller in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protective Order - Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Scott M. Keller)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Nazir Mir)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Compliance with Subpoena)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Notice of Court Order)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (c/f 11/3 since Dark)))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Motion for Order (Seeking Relief from Waiver of Privileges)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Hearing on Dem...))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Order (Granting Application to File Under Seal)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Order (RULING (on Demurrer))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Brief (Defendants' Supplemental Brief re: Defendants' Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review to confirm receipt of simultaneous...))
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Order (RULING)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Application for Order Granting Leave to file Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/30/2021)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order (1) Granting Leave ...))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER AWARDING PLAINTIFF FEES AND COSTS RE DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order (1) Granting Leave ...))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Order (RULING (on submitted matter))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/28/2021)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (4th))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Third Party Maceiko IP to Produce Business Records)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Application (to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Joseph Ross' Motion to Appoint Receiver)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Scott M. Keller in Support of Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Conditionally Sealed Documents)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRIAN WEISS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF JOSEPH ROSS MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOSEPH ROSS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER [REDACTED])
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF COURT ORDER)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF JOSEPH ROSS? MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Objection (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion [Redacted])
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Declaration (Appendix of Third-Party Declarations in Support of Opposition)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary to Declarations Submitted in Support of Opposition to Motion [Redacted])
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROSS, TO APPOINT RECEIVER; . MOT...))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Documents in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Steven Goldsobel [Redacted])
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice (of Filing Publicly Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Scott M. Keller)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (in Support of Applications to File Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AND ENTRY OF ORDER ON MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (OF NOVEMBER 30, 2021)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Brief (Supplemental Brief in Support of Applications to File Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROSS, TO APPOINT RECEIVER))
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (File Under Seal)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Order ((granting in part ex parte))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Joseph Ross and Ross International's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Re Hearing Dates)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Compliance with Subpoena)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Re Hearing Dates))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Summons (TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion re Dana Styck Subpoena)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Compel Subpoena)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Freshtec's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena (c/f 12/...))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Notice of Court Order)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Compel Third Party)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Order (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Order (RULING)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Order (RULING)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Reply (ISO Motion for Order Seeking Relief)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Seeking relief from the waiver of...))
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (CSR: Shawnda R. Dorn/ #11387)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Notice of Motion)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice (Errata)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Application (to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Declaration (Vandad Khosravirad)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF STEVEN GOLDSOBEL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDNATS? MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Quash Summons)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Reply (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Declaration (Joseph Ross)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Application (to File Under Seal)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Response (to Objection)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Order (Granting Defendants' Application to File Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Order (RULING (on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Objection (TO NEWLY SUBMITTED DECLARATION OF NAZIR MIR; REQUEST FOR LEAVE IN THE ALTERNATIVE)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (CSR: Cheri Bullock/ #4714)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROSS, TO APPOINT RECEIVER; . MOT...))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.