Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Javaheri Hamid, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against 24 Hour Fitness Usa Inc., represented by Nick Jack, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael E. Whitaker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael E. Whitaker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Hamid Javaheri (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Hamid Javaheri (Plaintiff); As to: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 19, 2020Complaint
Date: May 19, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 27, 2020PI General Order
Date: May 27, 2020Answer
Date: July 07, 2020Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: July 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: January 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY DISCHARGE
Date: March 02, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: July 15, 2021Answer
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 01/04/2021)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.