Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Stickle Anna An Individual, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kermani-Nejad Ramin, Yasin Alaa A, Leonardo Mark J., against Ponce Ruben, Walmart Inc. A Corporation, Williams Darrin An Individual, represented by Smith Andrew O., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to Continue Trial; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-31T00:00:00Declaration ISO MTC Further Rsp to FI 4; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Declaration ISO Mtn to Continue Trial; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: June 29, 2021Separate Statement
Date: July 08, 2021Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: July 12, 2021Motion for Sanctions
Date: July 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: August 02, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: August 23, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: September 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: September 14, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: February 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR IN THE ...)
Date: February 24, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: March 04, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: March 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: April 28, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 03, 2022Motion to Bifurcate
Date: May 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: May 11, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 12, 2022Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO WALMART'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: May 13, 2022Separate Statement
Date: May 19, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 24, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 19, 2022Separate Statement
Date: May 24, 2022Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: May 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: May 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: May 27, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 31, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: June 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE)
Date: June 07, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: June 10, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 10, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: June 15, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 23, 2022Separate Statement
Date: July 06, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 07, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 11, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 29, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 02, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 13, 2023Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES
Date: January 13, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION ISO MTN TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: January 19, 2023Separate Statement
Date: January 19, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 19, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION ISO MTC FURTHER RSP TO SI 8
Date: January 19, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION ISO MTC FURTHER RSP TO FI 4
Date: January 19, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION ISO MTC FURTHER RSP TO RFA 4
Date: January 19, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 24, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2023
Date: April 24, 2023Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: May 15, 2023Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO ADVANCE INFORMAL DISCOVERY...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Continue Trial) Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing the He...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order (Date: )) Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing the He...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Declaration (ISO MTC Further Rsp to SI 8) Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Declaration (ISO MTC Further Rsp to FI 4) Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Motion to Compel ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Submit to Second Med...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (ISO MTC Further Rsp to RFA 4) Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Declaration ISO MTC Further Rsp to SI 8; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-31T00:00:00Declaration ISO Mtn to Continue Trial; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Consider Plaintiff's Late Filed Opposition to Motion to Bifurcate)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 18, 2020Complaint
Date: May 18, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 18, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 19, 2020PI General Order
Date: May 27, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 24, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 04, 2020Answer
Date: December 28, 2020Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: April 21, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 19, 2021Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: July 19, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 14, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: February 14, 2022Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: February 14, 2022Association of Attorney
Date: February 17, 2022Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: February 22, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 22, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: February 22, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: April 14, 2022Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: April 15, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 15, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 20, 2022Answer (of Walmart Inc to Plaintiff's Complaint) Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO ADVANCE INFORMAL DISCOVERY...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Continue Trial) Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Mtn to Continue Trial) Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Motion of Plaintiff for Sanctions against Walmart for Spoliation of Evidence -[Res ID: _0468]
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO ADVANCE INFORMAL DISCOVERY...))
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Answer (of Walmart Inc to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (TO ADVANCE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial, or in the ...))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO ADVANCE INFORMAL DISCOVERY...))
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (by Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Strike Punitive Damages From Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulated Protective Order)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.) of )
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order (Date: ))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Consider Plai...))
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing the He...))
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial, or in the Alternative, Shortening Time)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Defendant's Motion to Bifurcate Trial Regarding Liability and Damages)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Advancing the Hearing Date on Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial or Shorten Time
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of it's Motion to Continue Trial and Related Deadlines)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate (TRIAL REGARDING LIABILITY AND DAMAGES)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Walmart's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing the He...))
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Declaration ISO MTC Further Rsp to RFA 4; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (by Plaintiff) Filed by Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Consider Plai...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial, or in the ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulated Protective Order) Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Anna Stickle, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by Walmart Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO ADVANCE INFORMAL DISCOVERY...))
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Answer (of Walmart Inc to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (by Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (TO ADVANCE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Motion of Plaintiff for Sanctions against Walmart for Spoliation of Evidence -[Res ID: _0468]
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulated Protective Order)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.) of 08/23/2021)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO ADVANCE INFORMAL DISCOVERY...))
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order (Date: 06/24/2021))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Strike Punitive Damages From Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial, or in the ...))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial, or in the Alternative, Shortening Time)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions (FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST WALMART FOR SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE;)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.