Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Macario Estevao, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Davis-Houston Whitney, against Captivated Artist Production Inc., Munroe Roberta Marie, represented by Gharapetian Alex, Streeter Daniel T. Jr., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Katherine Chilton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2020 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Estevao MacArio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Captivated Artist Production, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 05, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Estevao MacArio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Trial Setting Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Estevao MacArio (Plaintiff); As to: Roberta Marie Munroe (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Estevao MacArio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Whitney Davis-Houston (Attorney)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Captivated Artist Production, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 28, 2023Motion to Vacate Order of Dismissal; Filed by: Estevao MacArio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Roberta Marie Munroe (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Roberta Marie Munroe (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Declaration in support of New Trial Motion; Filed by: Captivated Artist Production, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 06, 2023Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: October 05, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings - Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: October 08, 2020Notice of Reclassification - Notice of Reclassification
Date: October 08, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 15, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 15, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 15, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 10, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: November 10, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 10, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)
Date: February 24, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Trial Setting Conference) of 02/24/2021
Date: February 24, 2021Motion to Vacate (name extension) - Motion to Vacate Order of Dismissal
Date: June 24, 2021Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 24, 2021Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing - Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: November 14, 2022Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Continuance
Date: November 14, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: February 28, 2023Affidavit (name extension) - Election To Forgo Affidavit (CCP Section 170.6)
Date: April 12, 2023Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: April 12, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: Estevao MacArio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Estevao MacArio (Plaintiff); As to: Roberta Marie Munroe (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Estevao MacArio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Whitney Davis-Houston (Attorney)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Estevao MacArio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Estevao MacArio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Estevao MacArio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Motion to Vacate Order of Dismissal; Filed by: Estevao MacArio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Trial Setting Conference) of 02/24/2021; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.