Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Li Krista Marie, Li Raymond, Golden State Finance Authority, Ygrene Energy Fund California Llc, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Myers David A, Myers David Allen, Ragland Karen A., Rousso Mary A., against Barry Kenneth, Golden State Finance Authority, Los Angeles County Tax Collector, Mek Acquisitions Llc, Ygrene Energy Fund California Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Paluch Daniel, Paluch Daniel Raphael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management148 days |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Default entered as to Kenneth Barry; On the Complaint filed by Krista Marie Li, et al. on
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: YGRENE ENERGY FUND CALIFORNIA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff); Raymond Li (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff); Raymond Li (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: YGRENE ENERGY FUND CALIFORNIA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff); Raymond Li (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Raymond Li (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Declaration RE: CALCULATION OF INTEREST; Filed by: Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff); Raymond Li (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Default entered as to Kenneth Barry; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Krista Marie Li, et al. on
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: November 17, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 18, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: November 18, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 08, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: December 08, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 05, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 19, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: CROSS-DEFENDANT KENNETH BARRY)
Date: February 26, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: June 29, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 14, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF KAREN A. RAGLAND RE: STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE POST ADR)
Date: March 30, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: March 30, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 01, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: May 20, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: June 08, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: July 06, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION RE: CALCULATION OF INTEREST
Date: July 06, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 06, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)
Date: July 27, 2022Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: August 09, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: August 23, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 22, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF KAREN A. RAGLAND RE: DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING
Date: September 28, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 02, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)
Date: October 13, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 24, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 24, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: February 28, 2023Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: March 01, 2023Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 21, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)
Date: March 03, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 22, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 07, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: March 24, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 14, 2023Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 01, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: May 02, 2023Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Cross-Defendant Kenneth Barry))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Notice (of errata re: verified complaint of plaintiffs Krista Marie Li and Raymond Li)
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Stipulation to set aside default;))
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 29, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT;)
Date: November 03, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Stipulation to set aside default;) of )
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Answer (Los Angeles County Treasurer Tax Collector)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Post ADR))
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR ORDER SUBS...))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Declaration (OF KAREN A. RAGLAND RE: STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Stipulation to set aside default;))
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice (of errata re: verified complaint of plaintiffs Krista Marie Li and Raymond Li)
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.