Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Weingarten Alex, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Freedman Eric, against Antares Underwriting Ltd., Certain Underwriters At Lloyd'S London Subscribing To Policy Number Iml-0114No-190029, Cutbirth Robert A., Landmark American Insurance Company, Syndicate Antares Syndicate No. 1274 Placed With Certain Underwriters At Lloyd'S London, (total of 6) See All represented by Felder B. Otis, Iversen Kristin L., Press Michelle, Tartaglio David, Watkins Harlan, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Steven J. Kleifield presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management150 days |
|
Filing DateApril 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Related Case
Date: January 07, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Order re Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Declaration of Justin Ehrlich iso Opp to M-Quash; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: September 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
Date: September 21, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 22, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 24, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 16, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: October 16, 2020Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT CUTBIRTH'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: October 29, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: October 29, 2020Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANT ROBERT A. CUTBIRTH'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: November 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT ROBE...)
Date: November 05, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: November 13, 2020Answer - ANSWER LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY’S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 18, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 13, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 20, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 21, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: January 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)
Date: January 25, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: January 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE FILING OF NOTICE OF RELATED CASES IN ALL...)
Date: February 25, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 25, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 05, 2021Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: April 20, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 13, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: April 26, 2021Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 27, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: April 28, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 28, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: April 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: May 10, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: May 25, 2021Order - ORDER RE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: May 24, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 27, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: June 04, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 11, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 06, 2021Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: August 06, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 27, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 08, 2021Status Conference Statement
Date: December 02, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO REQ FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ISO OPP TO M-QUASH
Date: December 27, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN EHRLICH ISO OPP TO M-QUASH
Date: December 27, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF MARCUS ISO OPP TO M-QUASH
Date: December 27, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEX WEINGARTEN ISO OPP TO M-QUASH
Date: December 27, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 27, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC FREEDMAN ISO OPP TO M-QUASH
Date: December 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 10, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: January 11, 2022Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: January 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: March 29, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 01, 2022Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: April 11, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 14, 2022Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 22, 2022Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: May 02, 2022Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: May 12, 2022Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: May 26, 2022Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL
Date: June 27, 2022Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: September 01, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 01, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 02, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: February 02, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR STAY PENDING ...)
Date: February 02, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 08, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE AND...)
Date: February 23, 2023Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 23, 2023Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: April 10, 2023Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: April 17, 2023Order (re Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by Landmark American Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike DEFENDANT ROBE...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANT ROBERT A. CUTBIRTH'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case (BC573661 and 20STCV15841))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE: Defendant's Peremptory Challenge)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant on...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant on...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (ID...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant on...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd)) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Order Setting Aside Default)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Justin Ehrlich iso Opp to M-Quash) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Stay Pending ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons MOTION BY SPECI...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Objection (to Req for Judicial Notice iso Opp to M-Quash) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Alex Weingarten iso Opp to M-Quash) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric Freedman iso Opp to M-Quash) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Landmark American Insurance Company (Defendant); As to: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by Alex Weingarten on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Motion for Leave TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Declaration Plaintiff's Declaration of Marcus iso Opp to M-Quash; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Declaration of Alex Weingarten iso Opp to M-Quash; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Declaration of Eric Freedman iso Opp to M-Quash; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Objection to Req for Judicial Notice iso Opp to M-Quash; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Objection to Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Landmark American Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B321148; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-08-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B321163; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 12, 2023Appeal Document B326539; DISMISSAL ORDER; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 12, 2023Appeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA B326539 NO DESIGNATION; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 15, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 24, 2020Complaint
Date: April 24, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: May 12, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 12, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: July 20, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 24, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 28, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 28, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: August 28, 2020Case Management Statement Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Informal Dis...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Motion for Leave (TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Answer (TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re filing of notice of related cases in all...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant on...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Declaration of Marcus iso Opp to M-Quash) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice (Of Filing Proof Of Service) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Landmark American Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) Filed by Robert A. Cutbirth (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Objection (to Request for Judicial Notice) Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Alex Weingarten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Answer (LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY?S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice (Of Filing Proof Of Service)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Case (BC573661 and 20STCV15841)) of )
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike DEFENDANT ROBE...))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Order (re Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Declaration ((OF HARLAN B. WATKINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ROBERT A. CUTBIRTH'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice (OF COURTS NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RESETTING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANT ROBERT A. CUTBIRTH'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Motion for Leave (TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT CUTBIRTH'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Objection (to Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case (BC573661 and 20STCV15841)))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE: Defendant's Peremptory Challenge))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF COURT ORDER SETTING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice (Defendant Robert A. Cutbirth's Notice of Court Order Setting Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Informal Dis...))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Answer (TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ROBERT A. CUTBIRTH'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re filing of notice of related cases in all...))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Declaration (In Support)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant on...))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (ID...))
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons MOTION BY SPECI...))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant on...))
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Objection (to Req for Judicial Notice iso Opp to M-Quash)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant on...))
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Declaration of Marcus iso Opp to M-Quash)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Quash Service of Summons of Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (DEFENDANT ROBERT A. CUTBIRTH'S INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE STATEMENT)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Justin Ehrlich iso Opp to M-Quash)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant on...))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Alex Weingarten iso Opp to M-Quash)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric Freedman iso Opp to M-Quash)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Motion re: (TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation and Order Setting Aside Default) of )
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Order Setting Aside Default))
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Setting Aside Default)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Answer (TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Declaration ((OF HARLAN B. WATKINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ROBERT A. CUTBIRTH'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Objection (to Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANT ROBERT A. CUTBIRTH'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike DEFENDANT ROBE...))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT CUTBIRTH'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice (Of Filing Proof Of Service)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Answer (LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY?S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE: Defendant's Peremptory Challenge))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case (BC573661 and 20STCV15841)))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re filing of notice of related cases in all...))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Motion for Leave (TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Answer (TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/03/2021)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF COURT ORDER SETTING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 05/10/2021)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice (OF COURTS NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RESETTING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Order (re Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ROBERT A. CUTBIRTH'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Informal Dis...))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/27/2021)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Declaration (In Support)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice (Defendant Robert A. Cutbirth's Notice of Court Order Setting Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (DEFENDANT ROBERT A. CUTBIRTH'S INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE STATEMENT)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant on...))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (ID...))
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 06/25/2021)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant on...))
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant on...))
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Objection (to Req for Judicial Notice iso Opp to M-Quash)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons MOTION BY SPECI...))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Quash Service of Summons of Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant on...))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric Freedman iso Opp to M-Quash)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Declaration of Marcus iso Opp to M-Quash)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Justin Ehrlich iso Opp to M-Quash)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Alex Weingarten iso Opp to M-Quash)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.