Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Agro Merchants Carson Llc, Agro Merchants Corporation, Agro Merchants North America Holdings Inc., Jaime Samuel, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Cardenas Sergio R. Esq., Ruby Emily A. Esq., Munro Elizabeth C., Vartazarian Steven R, against 1 To 50 Inclusive Does, Agro Merchants Carson Llc, Agro Merchants Corporation, Agro Merchants Nai Holdings Llc, Agro Merchants North America Holdings Inc., (total of 13) See All represented by Chermela Jason, Chermela Jason Ryan Esq., Earley Derek Alan Esq., Hufnagel Robert Allen, Hufnagel Robert Allen Esq., (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael E. Whitaker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 24, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: PDF Security Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: John Harold Horwitz (Attorney)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Citistaff Management Group, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: PDF Security Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Anthony Freeman, Jr. (Defendant); As to: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Citistaff Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Default entered as to Cool-Pak Solutions, LP; On the Complaint filed by Samuel Jaime on
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Citistaff Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Richard E. Morton (Attorney)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Anthony Freeman, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant Citistaff Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Strike; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Anthony Freeman, Jr. (Defendant); As to: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Reply Plaintiff's Reply to Agro Opposition to Motion to Amend; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Agro Merchants Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Citistaff Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Agro Merchants Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Citistaff Management Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Citistaff Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Agro Merchants Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Anthony Lamar Freeman, Jr. (Defendant); As to: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant Agro's Motion to Strike; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Citistaff Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Citistaff Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Agro Merchants Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Richard E. Morton, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: John Harold Horwitz, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Citistaff Management Group, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Citistaff Management Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Lamar Freeman, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Filed by Defendant Citistaff ...)
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Notice Notice of Association of Counsel; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-26T00:00:00Joint Witness List; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff); Citistaff Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case - [ PROPOSED ]; Filed by: Anthony Lamar Freeman, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Citistaff Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff); Citistaff Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Joint List Of Jury Instructions; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Citistaff Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff); Citistaff Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Samuel Jaime (Plaintiff); Citistaff Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 24, 2020Complaint
Date: April 24, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 24, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 24, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 30, 2020PI General Order
Date: May 15, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 10, 2020Answer
Date: June 19, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 19, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 22, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: June 22, 2020Answer
Date: June 22, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 31, 2020Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: August 31, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 21, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: September 21, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 01, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 18, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: December 22, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 08, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: February 26, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: May 26, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 14, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 16, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 25, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 29, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: July 01, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 14, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY
Date: August 09, 2021Answer
Date: July 23, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 11, 2021Answer
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: November 10, 2021Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO C.C.P. 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE
Date: November 24, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: December 09, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO LEAVE FOR AMEND
Date: March 09, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT S. KAHN
Date: March 09, 2022Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AGRO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AMEND
Date: March 14, 2022Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO CITISTAFF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AMEND
Date: March 14, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 06, 2022Answer
Date: April 11, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: May 20, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: June 06, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 06, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AGRO'S MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: June 17, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 06, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: July 21, 2022Amended Complaint - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 29, 2022Answer
Date: August 30, 2022Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: September 15, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: September 19, 2022Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2022Cross-Complaint
Date: September 26, 2022Answer
Date: October 26, 2022Answer
Date: October 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT CITISTAFF SOLUTIONS, IN...)
Date: November 09, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: November 14, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: January 05, 2023Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 03, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: January 19, 2023Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: February 03, 2023Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 01, 2023Answer
Date: March 06, 2023Answer - ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 06, 2023Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 13, 2023Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: March 20, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: March 23, 2023Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: April 26, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice (Of Change of Handling Attorney)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Plaintiff's Complaint to Allege Punitive Damages (CCP 3294))
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Robert S. Kahn)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition for Plaintiff's Motion to Leave for Amend)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTION TO C.C.P. 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.