Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Flores Cynthia, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Elihu Kaveh Sam, Roven Jonathan D. Esq., against Batingal Albert, Genesis Healthcare Llc, Ianieri Holly, Klein Zlaty, New Generation Health Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Graham Curtis Alan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Barbara Marie Scheper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara Marie Scheper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management153 days |
Filing DateApril 21, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions153 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Cynthia Flores (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Declaration Plaintiff's Declaration in support of Opposition; Filed by: Cynthia Flores (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cynthia Flores (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: ALBERT BATINGAL (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Cynthia Flores (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Cynthia Flores (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling at Case Management Conference; Filed by: Cynthia Flores (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Cynthia Flores (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: ALBERT BATINGAL (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SHARON CARE CENTER, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Cynthia Flores (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: ALBERT BATINGAL (Defendant); As to: Cynthia Flores (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Cynthia Flores (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: April 21, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 21, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 21, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: April 23, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 07, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 07, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 16, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: August 05, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 02, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: September 08, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION
Date: September 08, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 11, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 17, 2020Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: November 25, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: July 12, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 12, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ATTONEY LIEN FOR FEES AND COSTS
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: July 14, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 17, 2020Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: September 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY/DISMISS THE ...)
Date: September 21, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 21, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 21, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 23, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 25, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: December 21, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/16/2020)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling at Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay/Dismiss the ...))
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Declaration in support of Opposition)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Non-Appearance Case Review Re Sta...))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.