Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Golden Anthony, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Hakimi Anoush, against Matot Investment Llc A California Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 21, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 21, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 21, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 28, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: September 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)
Date: September 15, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 02, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With prejudice, Entire action) Filed by Anthony Golden (Plaintiff)
Date: October 20, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Anthony Golden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Anthony Golden (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Anthony Golden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Anthony Golden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Anthony Golden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.