Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dominguez Wilfredo, Harrison Donald, James River Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mangoli Shahram, Whibley Matthew J., against Dominguez Wilfredo, Gulilat Messeret, Raiser-Ca Llc, Raiser Llc, Rasier Llc, (total of 10) See All represented by Kustic Sarena L., Kustic Sarena Lynn, Nepomuceno Erwin A., Offenhauser Tyler D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 14, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice NOTICE OF ERRATA; Filed by: Messeret Gulilat (Defendant); As to: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Defendant); As to: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF LESLEY A. POWERS; Filed by: Messeret Gulilat (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Declaration OF LESLEY A. POWERS; Filed by: Messeret Gulilat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Raiser-CA, LLC (Defendant); As to: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Declaration of Lesley A. Powers; Filed by: JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant in Intervention)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Filed by: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Wilfredo Dominguez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by: Messeret Gulilat (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Wilfredo Dominguez (Defendant); As to: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Rasier, LLC (Defendant); As to: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Re Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff); As to: Messeret Gulilat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff); As to: Messeret Gulilat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff); Wilfredo Dominguez (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Declaration in Support; Filed by: Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wilfrido Dominguez (Defendant in Intervention)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Wilfredo Dominguez (Defendant); As to: Messeret Gulilat (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Wilfredo Dominguez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant in Intervention)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF?S COUNSEL?S FAILURE TO APPEAR ON 10/28/21 IN DEPARTMENT 28)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF?S COUNSEL?S FAILURE TO APPEAR ON IN DEPARTMENT 28)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 14, 2020Complaint
Date: April 14, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 14, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 14, 2020PI General Order
Date: April 23, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 06, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: September 11, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 18, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 23, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: September 25, 2020Answer
Date: October 21, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF LESLEY A. POWERS
Date: November 24, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SARENA KUSTIC
Date: January 21, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RYAN BUOSCIO
Date: January 21, 2021Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: January 21, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: February 01, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: February 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: February 25, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LIFTING OF STAY)
Date: September 28, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LESLEY A. POWERS
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: October 15, 2021Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)
Date: October 18, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: October 21, 2021Demand for Jury Trial
Date: October 21, 2021Answer
Date: October 21, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: October 28, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL F...)
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: December 09, 2021Complaint in Intervention
Date: March 28, 2022Answer
Date: April 26, 2022Cross-Complaint
Date: April 27, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 27, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 24, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 26, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: June 13, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: June 21, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 08, 2022Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: August 08, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF LESLEY A. POWERS
Date: August 25, 2022Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: September 26, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: October 04, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 14, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: February 22, 2023Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Rasier, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Lesley A. Powers) Filed by JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by Raiser-CA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Wilfredo Dominguez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Wilfredo Dominguez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Wilfredo Dominguez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ERRATA) Filed by Messeret Gulilat (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice) Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed by JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Declaration (in Support) Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Request Entr...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal f...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Wilfredo Dominguez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Motion to Compel Arbitration) Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Declaration (OF LESLEY A. POWERS) Filed by Messeret Gulilat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order (eFiling) Filed by Messeret Gulilat (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Wilfredo Dominguez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Lifting of Stay)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff); Wilfredo Dominguez (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Wilfrido Dominguez (Defendant in Intervention)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration) Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF LESLEY A. POWERS) Filed by Messeret Gulilat (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Wilfredo Dominguez (Cross-Complainant); Wilfredo Dominguez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal f...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Donald Harrison (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion for Leave to File Complaint-in-Intervention Off Calendar)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF LESLEY A. POWERS)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Sarena Kustic)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration (AND DISMISS OR STAY THE ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Ryan Buoscio)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ERRATA)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Lifting of Stay))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF LESLEY A. POWERS)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Request Entr...))
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal f...))
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal f...))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Sarena Kustic)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration (AND DISMISS OR STAY THE ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Declaration (OF LESLEY A. POWERS)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Ryan Buoscio)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ERRATA)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Request Entr...))
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF LESLEY A. POWERS)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Lifting of Stay))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.